BILL NUMBER: AB 2445ENROLLED BILL TEXT PASSED THE SENATE AUGUST 23, 2012 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY AUGUST 28, 2012 AMENDED IN SENATE AUGUST 6, 2012 AMENDED IN SENATE JUNE 4, 2012 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 9, 2012 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MARCH 26, 2012 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Dickinson FEBRUARY 24, 2012 An act to amend Sections 8164.1, 8164.2, 8164.3, and 9149.1 of the Government Code, relating to the State Capitol. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 2445, Dickinson. State Capitol. (1) Existing law provides that the Capitol Area Plan is the official state master plan for the development of the central city of the City of Sacramento, and provides that the Department of General Services is responsible for the ongoing formulation and revision of this plan. Existing law establishes the Capitol Area Committee, which consists of 9 appointed members, for the purpose of independently reviewing reports of the department to the Legislature and counsel and advising the department in carrying out its responsibilities regarding the Capitol Area Plan. Existing law requires the committee to meet at least quarterly or upon the call of the chairperson or the written request of any 3 members. Existing law provides for the repeal of the provisions that establish and govern the operation of the Capitol Area Committee on January 1, 2013. This bill instead would require the committee to meet annually and upon the call of the chairperson or the written request of any 3 members. The bill would extend the repeal date for those provisions regarding the committee to January 1, 2018, thereby extending the operation of the committee by an additional 5 years. (2) Existing law establishes the Historic State Capitol Commission for the purpose of providing advisory review of the maintenance, restoration, development, and management of the historic State Capitol. Existing law defines the term "historic State Capitol" for this purpose as the building housing the state legislative offices and chambers, situated in the area bounded by 10th, L, 15th, and N Streets in the City of Sacramento, except the east annex thereto. This bill would revise this definition by providing that the historic State Capitol also includes the portions of the State Capitol Building Annex that contain historic fabric, as defined, and Capitol Park, provided that Capitol Park will be included in the historic State Capitol only upon the adoption by the Joint Rules Committee of a master plan regarding Capitol Park. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 8164.1 of the Government Code is amended to read: 8164.1. There is in state government a Capitol Area Committee consisting of nine members who shall be appointed in the following manner: (a) Four members of the committee shall be appointed by the Governor of which at least one member shall be appointed from a list of three candidates submitted by the City of Sacramento and at least one member shall be appointed from a list of three candidates submitted by the County of Sacramento. Two members shall be appointed for a term expiring December 31, 1979, and two for a term expiring December 31, 1981. (b) Two members shall be appointed by the Speaker of the Assembly, one of whom may be a Member of the Assembly, and two members shall be appointed by the Senate Rules Committee, one of whom may be a Member of the Senate. Legislative members of the committee shall meet and, except as otherwise provided by the Constitution, advise the department to the extent that the advisory participation is not incompatible with their respective positions as Members of the Legislature. Of the four appointments by the Legislature, two shall be appointed for a term expiring December 31, 1979, and two for a term expiring December 31, 1981. (c) One shall be appointed by and serve at the pleasure of the director. Subsequent appointments pursuant to subdivisions (a) and (b) shall be for terms of four years, ending on December 31 of the fourth year after the end of the prior term, except that appointments to fill vacancies occurring for any reason other than the expiration of the term shall be for the unexpired portion of the term in which they occur. The members of the board shall hold office until their successors are appointed and qualify. The members of the committee shall not receive compensation from the state for their services under this article but, when called to attend a meeting of the committee, shall be reimbursed for their actual and necessary expenses incurred in connection with the meeting in accordance with the rules of the Department of Personnel Administration. (d) This section shall remain in effect only until January 1, 2018, and as of that date is repealed, unless a later enacted statute, that is enacted before January 1, 2018, deletes or extends that date. SEC. 2. Section 8164.2 of the Government Code is amended to read: 8164.2. (a) The committee shall elect a chairperson. The committee shall meet annually and upon the call of the chairperson or the written request of any three members. (b) This section shall remain in effect only until January 1, 2018, and as of that date is repealed, unless a later enacted statute, that is enacted before January 1, 2018, deletes or extends that date. SEC. 3. Section 8164.3 of the Government Code is amended to read: 8164.3. (a) It is the purpose of the committee to independently review the reports of the department to the Legislature and counsel and advise the department in carrying out its responsibilities related to the Capitol Area Plan. The committee may submit separate comments on the departmental reports on the Capitol Area Plan to the Legislature. The committee shall involve a broad cross section of interested citizens in the form of an advisory body. The advisory body shall serve without compensation. (b) This section shall remain in effect only until January 1, 2018, and as of that date is repealed, unless a later enacted statute, that is enacted before January 1, 2018, deletes or extends that date. SEC. 4. Section 9149.1 of the Government Code is amended to read: 9149.1. As used in this article, the following terms have the following meanings: (a) "Commission" means the Historic State Capitol Commission created by Section 9149.2. (b) "Historic State Capitol" means the building housing the state legislative offices and chambers, situated in the area bounded by 10th, L, 15th, and N Streets in the City of Sacramento, including the portions of the State Capitol Building Annex that contain historic fabric, and Capitol Park, provided that Capitol Park shall be included in the historic State Capitol for purposes of this article only upon the adoption by the Joint Rules Committee of a master plan regarding Capitol Park. (c) "Historic fabric" means original or added building or construction materials, features, and finishes that are deemed by the commission as historically or architecturally significant.