BILL NUMBER: AB 2491ENROLLED BILL TEXT PASSED THE SENATE AUGUST 20, 2012 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY AUGUST 24, 2012 AMENDED IN SENATE AUGUST 6, 2012 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MARCH 29, 2012 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Blumenfield FEBRUARY 24, 2012 An act to amend Section 52203 of the Education Code, relating to pupil instruction. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 2491, Blumenfield. Pupil instruction: gifted and talented pupil program: standard for pupil identification. Existing law states the intent of the Legislature to improve the quality of existing programs for gifted and talented pupils, and to ensure that pupils from economically disadvantaged and varying cultural backgrounds be provided with full participation in gifted and talented education (GATE) programs. Existing law requires the State Board of Education to review criteria, as specified, for programs for gifted and talented pupils proposed by applicant school districts. This bill would, upon the next revision of the specified criteria, require the state board to adopt a standard for pupil identification to ensure the identification procedures of an applicant school district provide economically disadvantaged pupils and pupils of varying cultural backgrounds with full participation in GATE programs, and would make other nonsubstantive changes. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 52203 of the Education Code is amended to read: 52203. (a) The state board shall maintain regulations governing the following areas: (1) Procedures that school district governing boards shall use in identifying gifted and talented pupils who are eligible for the program and in providing programs pursuant to this chapter. (2) Definitions of special day classes, part-time grouping, enrichment activities, cluster grouping, independent study, acceleration, postsecondary education opportunities, and other programs that the state board deems appropriate. (3) Establishment of allowable indirect cost expenditures that may be funded by gifted and talented program funds. (4) Other areas that the state board deems necessary to implement fully the intent and provisions of this chapter. (b) Upon the next revision of the criteria adopted pursuant to Section 52212, the state board shall adopt a standard for pupil identification to ensure the identification procedures of an applicant school district provide economically disadvantaged pupils and pupils of varying cultural backgrounds with full participation in the programs pursuant to this chapter.