California 2011 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2534 Amended / Bill

Filed 03/29/2012

 BILL NUMBER: AB 2534AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MARCH 29, 2012 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Block FEBRUARY 24, 2012 An act to amend Section  5009.1 of the Public Resources   94950 of the Education  Code, relating to  state parks   private postsecondary education  . LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 2534, as amended, Block.  State parks: maintenance and operation.   Private postsecondary education: California Private Postsecondary Education Act of 2009   .   Existing law, the California Private Postsecondary Education Act of 2009, provides for the regulation of private postsecondary educational institutions by the Bureau for Private Postsecondary Education in the Department of Consumer Affairs. Existing law repeals that act on January 1, 2015.   This bill would instead repeal that act on January 1, 2016, thus extending the existence of the act by one year.   Under existing law, the act specifies conduct by regulated institutions that, if undertaken, is a crime.   Because this bill would extend the application of those criminal provision, it would impose a state-mandated local program.   The California Constitution requires the state to reimburse local agencies and school districts for certain costs mandated by the state. Statutory provisions establish procedures for making that reimbursement.   This bill would provide that no reimbursement is required by this act for a specified reason.   Existing law authorizes the Department of Parks and Recreation to enter into an agreement to receive money from any entity for the maintenance or operation, on a nonprofit basis, of a designated state park unit or facility. Existing law requires the money received to be deposited into a separate account in the State Park Contingent Fund to be used to supplement existing resources for enhancing the maintenance and operation of the unit or facility.   This bill would make technical, nonsubstantive changes to those provisions.  Vote: majority. Appropriation:  no   yes  . Fiscal committee:  no   yes  . State-mandated local program:  no   yes  . THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS:  SECTION 1.   Section 94950 of the     Education Code   is amended to read:  94950. This chapter shall remain in effect only until January 1,  2015   2016  , and as of that date is repealed, unless a later enacted statute, that is enacted before January 1,  2015   2016  , deletes or extends that date.  SEC. 2.   No reimbursement is required by this act pursuant to Section 6 of Article XIII B of the California Constitution because the only costs that may be incurred by a local agency or school district will be incurred because this act creates a new crime or infraction, eliminates a crime or infraction, or changes the penalty for a crime or infraction, within the meaning of Section 17556 of the Government Code, or changes the definition of a crime within the meaning of Section 6 of Article XIII B of the California Constitution.   SECTION 1.   Section 5009.1 of the Public Resources Code is amended to read: 5009.1. (a) The department may enter into an agreement to accept funds from any person, corporation or other business entity, or organization for the maintenance or operation, on a nonprofit basis, of a designated state park system unit or facility. Funds so received shall be deposited in a separate account in the State Park Contingent Fund. The funds received shall supplement existing resources for the purpose of enhancing the maintenance or operation of the unit or facility, with priority given to preventing closure or reduced hours of service to the public. The department and the sponsoring person, entity, or organization shall specify in the agreement the level of service that is to be performed. (b) The department may enter into an agreement to accept services from any person, corporation or other business entity, or organization for the cleanup, repair, or enhancement of any designated state park system unit or facility. Under the direction of the department, these services shall supplement existing staff resources for the purpose of enhancing the maintenance and operation of the unit or facility. (c) The director may authorize the erection of an appropriate sign in recognition of the sponsorship, consistent with existing law and with the rules and regulations of the department regarding signs in units of the state park system.