California 2011 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2583 Amended / Bill

Filed 08/21/2012

 BILL NUMBER: AB 2583AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN SENATE AUGUST 21, 2012 AMENDED IN SENATE JULY 6, 2012 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 9, 2012 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Blumenfield FEBRUARY 24, 2012 An act to amend Section 25722.8 of, and to add Section 25722.9 to, the Public Resources Code, and to amend Section 22518 of the Vehicle Code, relating to vehicular air pollution. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 2583, as amended, Blumenfield. Alternatively fueled vehicles: state fleet: public parking. Existing law requires the Secretary of State and Consumer Services, in consultation with the Department of General Services and other appropriate agencies, on or before July 1, 2009, to develop and implement, and submit to the Legislature and the Governor, a plan to reduce or displace the state fleet's consumption of petroleum products. This bill would require the department  to purchase, or approve contracts for the purchase of, new vehicles for the state fleet that are alternatively fueled vehicles, as defined,  to encourage the operation of state alternatively fueled vehicles  , as defined,  on the alternative fuel for which the vehicle is designed and the development of commercial infrastructure for alternative fuel pumps and charging stations at or near state vehicle fueling or parking sites, and to work with other public agencies to incentivize and promote state employee operation of alternatively fueled vehicles through preferential or reduced-cost parking, access to charging, or other means.  The bill would authorize the department to provide grants or enter into interagency agreements to implement these goals.  The bill would require the department and the Department of Transportation to develop and implement advanced technology vehicle parking incentive programs in specified public parking facilities of 50 spaces or more and specified park-and-ride lots to incentivize the purchase and use of alternatively fueled vehicles, as defined, in the state, as specified. Existing law prohibits a person from engaging in vending or any other commercial activity on fringe or transportation corridor parking facilities constructed, maintained, or operated by the Department of Transportation. This bill would  exempt from   provide that  the above prohibition  a person implementing the advanced technology vehicle parking incentive programs   does not apply to alternatively fueled infrastructure programs in park-and-ride lots owned and operated by the Department of Transportation  . Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 25722.8 of the Public Resources Code is amended to read: 25722.8. (a) On or before July 1, 2009, the Secretary of State and Consumer Services, in consultation with the Department of General Services and other appropriate state agencies that maintain or purchase vehicles for the state fleet, including the campuses of the California State University, shall develop and implement, and submit to the Legislature and the Governor, a plan to improve the overall state fleet's use of alternative fuels, synthetic lubricants, and fuel-efficient vehicles by reducing or displacing the consumption of petroleum products by the state fleet when compared to the 2003 consumption level based on the following schedule: (1) By January 1, 2012, a 10-percent reduction or displacement. (2) By January 1, 2020, a 20-percent reduction or displacement. (b) Beginning April 1, 2010, and annually thereafter, the Department of General Services shall provide to the Department of Finance and the appropriate legislative committees of the Legislature a progress report on meeting the goals specified in subdivision (a). The Department of General Services shall also make the progress report available on its Internet Web site.  (c) (1) Except as provided in paragraph (2), the Department of General Services shall purchase, or approve contracts for the purchase of, new vehicles for the state fleet that are alternatively fueled vehicles based on the following schedule:   (A) Beginning January 1, 2013, 50 percent of the new vehicles purchased.   (B) Beginning January 1, 2015, 100 percent of the new vehicles purchased.   (2) Paragraph (1) shall not apply to the purchase of types of vehicles for which an alternatively fueled vehicle is not available.   (3)   (c)     (1)    The Department of General Services shall encourage, to the extent feasible, the operation of state alternatively fueled vehicles on the alternative fuel for which the vehicle is designed and the development of commercial infrastructure for alternative fuel pumps and charging stations at or near state vehicle fueling or parking sites.  (4)   (2)    The Department of General Services shall work with other public agencies to incentivize and promote, to the extent feasible, state employee operation of alternatively fueled vehicles through preferential or reduced-cost parking, access to charging, or other means.  (5) The Department of General Services may provide grants or enter into interagency agreements to implement this subdivision.   (6)   (3)    For purposes of this subdivision, "alternatively fueled vehicles" means light-, medium-, and heavy-duty vehicles that reduce petroleum usage and related emissions by using advanced technologies and fuels, including, but not limited to, hybrid, plug-in hybrid, battery electric, natural gas, or fuel cell vehicles and including those vehicles described in Section 5205.5 of the Vehicle Code. SEC. 2. Section 25722.9 is added to the Public Resources Code, to read: 25722.9. (a) For purposes of this section, "alternatively fueled vehicles" means light-, medium-, and heavy-duty vehicles that reduce petroleum usage and related emissions by using advanced technologies and fuels, including, but not limited to, hybrid, plug-in hybrid, battery electric, natural gas, or fuel cell vehicles and including those vehicles described in Section 5205.5 of the Vehicle Code. (b) The Department of General Services and the Department of Transportation shall develop and implement advanced technology vehicle parking incentive programs  , to the extent feasible,  in public parking facilities of 50 spaces or more operated by the Department of General Services and  , to the extent feasible,  park-and-ride lots owned and operated by the Department of Transportation to incentivize the purchase and use of alternatively fueled vehicles in the state. These programs shall provide meaningful, tangible benefits for drivers of alternatively fueled vehicles. These incentives may include preferential spaces, reduced fees, and fueling infrastructure for alternatively fueled vehicles that use these parking facilities or park-and-ride lots. SEC. 3. Section 22518 of the Vehicle Code is amended to read: 22518.  (a)    Fringe and transportation corridor parking facilities constructed, maintained, or operated by the Department of Transportation pursuant to Section 146.5 of the Streets and Highways Code shall be used only by persons using a bicycle or public transit, or engaged in ridesharing, including, but not limited to, carpools or vanpools. A person shall not park a vehicle 30 feet or more in length, engage in loitering or camping, or engage in vending or any other commercial activity  except to implement Section 25722.9 of the Public Resource Code,  on any fringe or transportation corridor parking facility.  (b) This section does not apply to alternatively fueled infrastructure programs in park-and-ride lots owned and operated by the Department of Transportation.