California 2011 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB274 Amended / Bill

Filed 06/14/2011

 BILL NUMBER: AB 274AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN SENATE JUNE 14, 2011 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MAY 10, 2011 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 27, 2011 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Garrick FEBRUARY 7, 2011 An act to add Section 1028.5 to the Unemployment Insurance Code, relating to unemployment insurance. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 274, as amended, Garrick. Unemployment insurance benefits: claims: right to respond. Existing law requires the Employment Development Department to provide notice of the filing of an unemployment claim to the claimant' s last employing unit, and requires the employing unit to submit, within 10 days after the mailing of the notice, any facts that may affect the claimant's eligibility for benefits, as specified, and permits this 10-day period to be extended for good cause. This bill would additionally require the department, when notifying an employing unit that an unemployment claim has been filed, to provide a direct link to its Internet Web site to the page that describes what circumstances establish good cause  for an extension of the 10-day period during which the employer may submit facts on the claim  , in accordance with specified procedures. Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 1028.5 is added to the Unemployment Insurance Code, to read: 1028.5. (a) When notifying an employing unit that an unemployment claim has been filed, the department shall provide a direct Internet Web site link to the page that describes what circumstances establish good cause  for an extension of the 10-day period during which the employer may submit facts on the claim  , which link is available at http://www.edd.ca.gov/UIBDG/Miscellaneous_MI_40.htm or its successor  Internet  Web site address, as it may be updated. (b) The department shall not be required to update its standard forms, publications, and signs to comply with subdivision (a) until all of its existing stock of forms, publications, and signs for this purpose is depleted.