California 2011 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB296 Amended / Bill

Filed 08/22/2012

 BILL NUMBER: AB 296AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN SENATE AUGUST 22, 2012 AMENDED IN SENATE AUGUST 21, 2012 AMENDED IN SENATE JUNE 21, 2011 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MAY 27, 2011 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 25, 2011 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MARCH 31, 2011 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Skinner (Coauthors: Assembly Members Blumenfield, Fletcher, and Gordon) (Coauthor: Senator Hancock) FEBRUARY 9, 2011 An act  to add Section 14457 to the Government Code, and  to add Section 18941.9 to the Health and Safety Code  , and to add Part 5 (commencing with Section 71400) to Division 34 of the Public Resources Code  , relating to building standards. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 296, as amended, Skinner. Department of Transportation: paving materials. (1) Existing law provides that the Department of Transportation is responsible for the maintenance and improvement of the state highway system.  This bill would require the department to develop one or more standard specifications for cool pavements and materials, by January 1, 2014.   This bill would make legislative findings and declarations regarding the meaning of urban heat island effect (UHIE). The bill would require the California Environmental Protection Agency to develop a definition for the term UHIE and, upon completion of an UHIE index, develop a standard specification for sustainable or cool pavements.  (2) The California Building Standards Law requires any building standard adopted or proposed by a state agency to be submitted to, and approved or adopted by, the California Building Standards Commission prior to codification. This bill would require the commission, in the next triennial adoption process of the California Green Building Standards Code  that begins on or after January 1, 2015, to consider incorporating  those specifications proposed   a standard specification for sustainable or cool pavements that this bill would require the Department of Transportation to develop  in the Cool Pavements Handbook as additional strategies for Heat Island Effect: Hardscape Alternatives in the California Green Building Standards Code. Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS:  SECTION 1.   Section 14457 is added to the Government Code, to read: 14457. (a) On or before January 1, 2014, the department shall, through a new or existing process, develop one or more standard specifications for cool pavements or materials, and may identify existing standard specifications of the department that have cool pavements or materials. (b) The department, when developing sustainable cool pavement technologies and performing life cycle analyses of pavements, shall consider potential greenhouse gas reductions and energy reductions, and improvements to local public health, water quality, and other local and global benefits during the use phase of the pavement.   SECTION 1.   (a) The Legislature finds and declares that urban heat island effect is a phenomenon characterized by a temperature differential between developed and rural lands.   (b) It is the intent of the Legislature that the California Environmental Protection Agency develop a standard definition of the term "urban heat island effect."  SEC. 2. Section 18941.9 is added to the Health and Safety Code, to read: 18941.9. The commission shall, in the next triennial adoption process for the code adopted after  January 1, 2015   the development of a standard specification by the Department of Transportation pursuant to subdivision (b) of Section 71400 of the Public Resources Code  , consider incorporating  those specifications proposed pursuant to Section 14457 of the Government Code   that specification  as  an  additional  strategies   strategy  for Heat Island Effect: Hardscape Alternatives in the California Green Building Standards Code (Section A5.106.11.1 of Appendix 5 of Part 11 (commencing with Section 101.1) of Title 24 of the California Code of Regulations).  SEC. 3.   Part 5 (commencing with Section 71400) is added to Division 34 of the   Public Resources Code   , to read:   PART 5. URBAN HEAT ISLAND EFFECT 71400. (a) It is the intent of the Legislature that all of the following shall occur: (1) The California Environmental Protection Agency shall work with its partners on the Climate Action Team to develop heat reduction strategies that include urban forestry, cool roofs, and sustainable or cool pavements. (2) The California Environmental Protection Agency shall develop a definition for the urban heat island effect. The definition shall include the extent and severity of an urban heat island effect index for California cities such that the cities can have a quantifiable goal for heat reduction. (3) In support of this effort, the Department of Transportation shall work with the California Environmental Protection Agency and other stakeholders on sustainable or cool pavement technologies and research. (b) Upon completion of a definition for an urban heat island effect index, the Department of Transportation shall develop a standard specification for sustainable or cool pavements that can be used to reduce the urban heat island effect index.