California 2011 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB306 Amended / Bill

Filed 06/14/2011

 BILL NUMBER: AB 306AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN SENATE JUNE 14, 2011 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MAY 27, 2011 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 27, 2011 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Gatto (Coauthors: Assembly Members Blumenfield, Galgiani, Gordon, Nestande, Wagner, and Williams) FEBRUARY 9, 2011 An act to add and repeal Section 25325 of the Public Resources Code, relating to energy. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 306, as amended, Gatto. Energy: piezoelectric transducers: study. Existing law requires the State Energy Resources Conservation and Development Commission (Energy Commission), on a biennial basis beginning in 2003, to adopt an integrated energy policy report providing information on specified related to energy. Existing law creates the Public Interest Research, Development, and Demonstration Program, to be administered by the Energy Commission, and requires the Energy Commission to expend the moneys in the Public Interest Research, Development, and Demonstration Fund, upon appropriation by the Legislature, to implement that program. This bill would  authorize   require  the Energy Commission to conduct research on generating electricity using piezoelectric transducers under roadways or railways. The bill would require the Energy Commission to collaborate with the Department of Transportation to establish pilot projects that would employ piezoelectric-based  energy harvesting   energy-harvesting  technology, if the Energy Commission determines that  doing so is appropriate   the technology has the potential to generate electricity with performance, reliability, and cost projections that are comparable to existing renewable or emerging renewable energy sources  . The bill would authorize the Energy Commission to expend the moneys in the Public Interest Research, Development, and Demonstration Fund or the Energy Resources Program Account, upon appropriation by the Legislature, to implement this research.  If the   The  Energy Commission  conducts the research, it  would be required to report its findings in the integrated energy policy report adopted in 2013. These provisions would be repealed on January 1, 2015. Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 25325 is added to the Public Resources Code, to read: 25325. (a) The commission  may   shall  conduct research on generating electricity using piezoelectric technology under roadways and railways pursuant to this chapter or Chapter 7 (commencing with Section 25600). (b) For purposes of conducting the research  described   required  by this section, the commission shall collaborate with the Department of Transportation to establish a pilot project or projects that would employ piezoelectric-based  energy harvesting   energy-harvesting  technology if the commission finds, based on initial research, that  a pilot project is appropriate.   the technology has the potential to generate electricity with performance, reliability, and cost projections that are comparable to existing renewable or emerging renewable energy sources.  (c) The commission may expend the moneys in the Public Interest Research, Development, and Demonstration Fund established pursuant to Section 384 of the Public Utilities Code or the Energy Resources Program Account established pursuant to Section 25801, upon appropriation by the Legislature, to implement this section. (d) As a part of the integrated energy policy report that is adopted in 2013, the commission shall report the findings of the research  , if the commission conducted the research   performed  pursuant to subdivision (a). (e) This section shall remain in effect only until January 1, 2015, and as of that date is repealed, unless a later enacted statute, that is enacted before January 1, 2015, deletes or extends that date.