California 2011 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB334 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 06/15/2011

 BILL NUMBER: AB 334ENROLLED BILL TEXT PASSED THE SENATE JUNE 11, 2011 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY APRIL 4, 2011 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MARCH 7, 2011 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Members Bonnie Lowenthal and Furutani FEBRUARY 10, 2011 An act to amend Section 1064 of the Government Code, relating to community college board members. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 334, Bonnie Lowenthal. Community college board members: absence from the state. Existing law prohibits a member of the governing board of a school district from being absent from the state for a period of more than 60 days, with specified exceptions, including that the absence may be extended by the governing board of the school district for an additional 30 days in the case of illness or other urgent necessity. This bill would apply these provisions to a member of the board of a community college district, and would additionally authorize the governing board of a school district or a community college district to authorize an absence of an unlimited duration in the case of illness or other urgent necessity. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 1064 of the Government Code is amended to read: 1064. No member of the governing board of a school district or a community college district shall be absent from the state for more than 60 days, except in any of the following situations: (a) Upon business of the school district or community college district with the approval of the board. (b) (1) With the consent of the governing board of the school district or community college district for an additional period not to exceed a total absence of 90 days. (2) In the case of illness or other urgent necessity, and upon a proper showing thereof, the time limited for absence from the state may be extended by the governing board of the school district or community college district. (c) For federal military deployment, not to exceed an absence of a total of six months, as a member of the Armed Forces of the United States or the California National Guard. If the absence of a member of the governing board of a school district or community college district pursuant to this subdivision exceeds six months, the governing board may approve an additional six-month absence upon a showing that there is a reasonable expectation that the member will return within the second six-month period, and the governing board may appoint an interim member to serve in his or her absence. If two or more members of the governing board of a school district or community college district are absent by reason of the circumstances described in this subdivision, and those absences result in the inability to establish a quorum at a regular meeting, the governing board may immediately appoint one or more interim members as necessary to enable the governing board to conduct business and discharge its responsibilities. (d) The term of an interim member of the governing board of a school district or community college district appointed pursuant to subdivision (c) may not extend beyond the return of the absent member, nor may it extend beyond the next regularly scheduled election for that office.