BILL NUMBER: AB 367ENROLLED BILL TEXT PASSED THE SENATE JULY 2, 2012 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY JULY 5, 2012 AMENDED IN SENATE MAY 21, 2012 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY JANUARY 4, 2012 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Smyth FEBRUARY 14, 2011 An act to amend, repeal, and add Section 683 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to healing arts. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 367, Smyth. Board of Behavioral Sciences: reporting. Under existing law, the Board of Behavioral Sciences is responsible for the licensure and regulation of marriage and family therapists, licensed educational psychologists, clinical social workers, and licensed professional clinical counselors. Existing law requires certain healing arts boards to report to the State Department of Health Care Services specified licensure information relating to any person whose license has been revoked, suspended, surrendered, or made inactive by the licensee in order to prevent state reimbursement for services provided after the cancellation of a license. This bill would, on and after January 1, 2015, make that reporting requirement applicable to the Board of Behavioral Sciences. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 683 of the Business and Professions Code is amended to read: 683. (a) A board shall report, within 10 working days, to the State Department of Health Care Services the name and license number of a person whose license has been revoked, suspended, surrendered, made inactive by the licensee, or placed in another category that prohibits the licensee from practicing his or her profession. The purpose of the reporting requirement is to prevent reimbursement by the state for Medi-Cal and Denti-Cal services provided after the cancellation of a provider's professional license. (b) "Board," as used in this section, means the Dental Board of California, the Medical Board of California, the Board of Psychology, the State Board of Optometry, the California State Board of Pharmacy, the Osteopathic Medical Board of California, the State Board of Chiropractic Examiners, and the California Board of Occupational Therapy. (c) This section shall remain in effect only until January 1, 2015, and as of that date is repealed, unless a later enacted statute, that is enacted before January 1, 2015, deletes or extends that date. SEC. 2. Section 683 is added to the Business and Professions Code, to read: 683. (a) A board shall report, within 10 working days, to the State Department of Health Care Services the name and license number of a person whose license has been revoked, suspended, surrendered, made inactive by the licensee, or placed in another category that prohibits the licensee from practicing his or her profession. The purpose of the reporting requirement is to prevent reimbursement by the state for Medi-Cal and Denti-Cal services provided after the cancellation of a provider's professional license. (b) "Board," as used in this section, means the Dental Board of California, the Medical Board of California, the Board of Psychology, the State Board of Optometry, the California State Board of Pharmacy, the Osteopathic Medical Board of California, the State Board of Chiropractic Examiners, the Board of Behavioral Sciences, and the California Board of Occupational Therapy. (c) This section shall become operative on January 1, 2015.