California 2011 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB401 Amended / Bill

Filed 05/09/2012

 BILL NUMBER: AB 401AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN SENATE MAY 9, 2012 AMENDED IN SENATE APRIL 26, 2012 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MAY 12, 2011 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 26, 2011 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Ammiano FEBRUARY 14, 2011 An act to amend Section 32228 of the Education Code, relating to school safety. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 401, as amended, Ammiano. School safety: Carl Washington School Safety and Violence Prevention Act. Existing law states the intent of the Legislature that public schools have access to supplemental resources to combat bias on the basis of race, color, religion, ancestry, national origin, disability, gender, gender identity, gender expression, or sexual orientation, as defined, and to prevent and respond to acts of hate violence and bias-related incidents. A provision of existing law prohibits the term sexual orientation from including pedophilia. This bill would  remove that prohibition   delete the provision related to pedophilia  . Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: no. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 32228 of the Education Code is amended to read: 32228. (a) It is the intent of the Legislature that public schools serving pupils in any of grades 8 to 12, inclusive, have access to supplemental resources to establish programs and strategies that promote school safety and emphasize violence prevention among children and youth in  the  public schools. (b) It is also the intent of the Legislature that public schools have access to supplemental resources to combat bias on the basis of race, color, religion, ancestry, national origin, disability, gender, gender identity, gender expression, or sexual orientation, as defined in subdivision (r) of Section 12926 of the Government Code, and to prevent and respond to acts of hate violence and bias-related incidents. (c) It is further the intent of the Legislature that schoolsites receiving funds pursuant to this article accomplish all of the following goals: (1) Teach pupils techniques for resolving conflicts without violence. (2) Train school staff and administrators to support and promote conflict resolution and mediation techniques for resolving conflicts between and among pupils. (3) Reduce incidents of violence at the schoolsite with an emphasis on prevention and early detection. (4) Provide age-appropriate instruction in domestic violence prevention, dating violence prevention, and interpersonal violence prevention.