California 2011 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB404 Amended / Bill

Filed 08/06/2012

 BILL NUMBER: AB 404AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN SENATE AUGUST 6, 2012 AMENDED IN SENATE JUNE 21, 2012 AMENDED IN SENATE MAY 9, 2012 AMENDED IN SENATE JUNE 21, 2011 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 25, 2011 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MARCH 8, 2011 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Gatto FEBRUARY 14, 2011 An act to add Section 23028 to the Government Code, relating to local government. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 404, as amended, Gatto. Local government: lobbyists: county assessors. Existing law provides for the governance of counties. Existing law sets forth the powers and duties of the officers of a county and the board of supervisors. Existing law sets forth the qualifications of the county assessor, as specified. Existing constitutional provisions authorize the establishment of an assessment appeals board of a county. This bill would, in a county that regulates lobbying before the board of supervisors by ordinance, require the board of supervisors of the county to adopt amendments to the ordinance to apply its provisions to those who lobby before the county assessor, county assessor's staff, or the county assessment appeals board. By adding to the duties of a county, the bill would impose a state-mandated local program. The bill would provide that its provisions do not apply to property owners, and are not to be construed to prohibit a tax agent from charging a contingency fee, as specified. The California Constitution requires the state to reimburse local agencies and school districts for certain costs mandated by the state. Statutory provisions establish procedures for making that reimbursement. This bill would provide that, if the Commission on State Mandates determines that the bill contains costs mandated by the state, reimbursement for those costs shall be made pursuant to these statutory provisions. Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: yes. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 23028 is added to the Government Code, to read: 23028. (a) In a county that regulates lobbying before the board of supervisors by ordinance, the board of supervisors of the county shall adopt amendments to the ordinance to apply its provisions to  those who lobby   any person who represents a taxpayer for compensation  before the county assessor,  county assessor's staff, or   employees of the county assessor,  the county assessment appeals board  ,   the county board of equalization, or any assessment hearing officer who makes recommendations to the county board of equalization or the county assessment appeals board  . (b) Subdivision (a) shall not apply to a property owner in connection with any matter before a county assessor,  county assessor's staff, or   employees of the county assessor,  the county assessment appeals board  , the county board of equalization, or any assessment hearing officer who makes recommendations to the county board of equalization or the county assessment appeals board  . (c) Nothing in this section shall be construed to prohibit a tax agent from charging a contingency fee in connection with any matter before a county assessor,  county assessor's staff, or   employees of the county assessor,  the county assessment appeals board  ,   the county board of equalization, or any assessment hearing officer who makes recommendations to the county board of equalization or the county assessment appeals board . SEC. 2. If the Commission on State Mandates determines that this act contains costs mandated by the state, reimbursement to local agencies and school districts for those costs shall be made pursuant to Part 7 (commencing with Section 17500) of Division 4 of Title 2 of the Government Code.