California 2011 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB417 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 07/08/2011

 BILL NUMBER: AB 417ENROLLED BILL TEXT PASSED THE SENATE JULY 1, 2011 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY JULY 7, 2011 AMENDED IN SENATE JUNE 20, 2011 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Bill Berryhill FEBRUARY 14, 2011 An act to add Section 8557 to the Business and Professions Code, relating to structural pest control. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 417, Bill Berryhill. Structural pest control. Existing law provides for the licensure and regulation of structural pest control operators by the Structural Pest Control Board within the Department of Pesticide Regulation. This bill would prohibit a city, county, or city and county from prohibiting a licensee of the board from engaging in the particular business, occupation, or profession for which he or she is licensed. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 8557 is added to the Business and Professions Code, to read: 8557. No city, county, or city and county shall prohibit a person or group of persons, authorized by the board by a license, certificate, or other such means under this chapter to engage in a particular business, from engaging in that business, occupation, or profession or any portion thereof as authorized in this chapter.