California 2011 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB432 Chaptered / Bill

Filed 09/07/2012

 BILL NUMBER: AB 432CHAPTERED BILL TEXT CHAPTER 229 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE SEPTEMBER 7, 2012 APPROVED BY GOVERNOR SEPTEMBER 7, 2012 PASSED THE SENATE AUGUST 6, 2012 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY AUGUST 22, 2012 AMENDED IN SENATE JUNE 21, 2012 AMENDED IN SENATE JUNE 21, 2011 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 26, 2011 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MARCH 31, 2011 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Dickinson (Coauthor: Senator Steinberg) FEBRUARY 14, 2011 An act to add Section 99270.6 to the Public Utilities Code, relating to transportation. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 432, Dickinson. Transit: Sacramento County. Existing law authorizes transportation planning agencies to administer transit funding made available under the Transportation Development Act. Existing law imposes certain financial requirements on transit operators making claims for transit funds, including requirements that fares collected by the operator cover a specified percentage of operating costs. In certain cases, transit operators are required to meet a higher percentage if they met that standard in the 1978-79 fiscal year. Existing law permits the Metropolitan Transportation Commission to make a determination as to whether transit operators serving a specified area have met the requirements for claims for transit funds by evaluating the operators as a group rather than individually. This bill would authorize the Sacramento Area Council of Governments to determine whether transit operators serving Sacramento County, as a group, have met the requirements for claims for transit funds. The bill would require the Sacramento Regional Transit District to cover no less than 23% of operating costs from fares even if the transit operators serving Sacramento County are evaluated as a group under this provision. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 99270.6 is added to the Public Utilities Code, to read: 99270.6. In determining whether there is compliance with Section 99268.1, 99268.2, 99268.3, 99268.4, 99268.5, or 99268.9, as the case may be, by operators serving the area of Sacramento County and the cities within the county, the Sacramento Area Council of Governments may make that determination for all or some of the operators as a group, if the Sacramento Area Council of Governments finds that the public transportation services of the operators grouped are coordinated. Notwithstanding any other provision of this article, the fare recovery ratio for the Sacramento Regional Transit District shall be no less than 23 percent.