California 2011 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB44 Amended / Bill

Filed 07/12/2011

 BILL NUMBER: AB 44AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN SENATE JULY 12, 2011 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MARCH 24, 2011 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY JANUARY 27, 2011 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Members Logue and Galgiani  (   Principal coauthor:   Assembly Member   Beth Gaines   )  DECEMBER 6, 2010 An act to amend Section 3058.6 of the Penal Code, relating to inmates. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 44, as amended, Logue. Inmates: release: notification. Existing law requires the Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation, when releasing prisoners on parole who have been convicted of a violent felony, as defined, or certain other felonies, as specified, to notify the law enforcement agency and the district attorney having jurisdiction over the community in which the person was convicted and also the law enforcement agency and district attorney having jurisdiction over the community in which the person is scheduled to be released. Existing law requires that this notification be made by mail at least 45 days prior to the scheduled release date, and provides deadlines for local authorities to respond with written comments regarding county placements, and for the department to reply. If notification cannot be provided within the 45 days due to an unanticipated release date change of an inmate, as specified, or because the department modifies its decision regarding the community of release due to comments received by the department from agencies in that community, existing law requires that notification be provided no less than 24 hours after a final decision is made regarding where the parolee is to be released. Existing law requires that if there is a change of county placement after the 45-day notice is given to local law enforcement and the district attorney relating to an out-of-county placement, notice to the ultimate county of placement shall be made upon the determination of the county of placement. This bill would require that notification be sent 60 days prior to the scheduled release date of an inmate. The bill would conform the timeline for local comments to the longer notification period, as specified. Existing law prohibits the department from restoring credits or taking administrative action resulting in an inmate being placed in a greater credit earning category that would result in notification being provided less than 45 days prior to the inmate's scheduled release date. This bill would conform this provision to its 60-day notification requirement. Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 3058.6 of the Penal Code is amended to read: 3058.6. (a) Whenever any person confined to state prison is serving a term for the conviction of a violent felony listed in subdivision (c) of Section 667.5, the Board of Parole Hearings, with respect to inmates sentenced pursuant to subdivision (b) of Section 1168 or the Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation, with respect to inmates sentenced pursuant to Section 1170, shall notify the sheriff or chief of police, or both, and the district attorney, who has jurisdiction over the community in which the person was convicted and, in addition, the sheriff or chief of police, or both, and the district attorney, having jurisdiction over the community in which the person is scheduled to be released on parole or rereleased following a period of confinement pursuant to a parole revocation without a new commitment. (b) (1) The notification shall be made by mail at least 60 days prior to the scheduled release date, except as provided in paragraph (3). In all cases, the notification shall include the name of the person who is scheduled to be released, whether or not the person is required to register with local law enforcement, and the community in which the person will reside. The notification shall specify the office within the Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation with the authority to make final determination and adjustments regarding parole location decisions. (2) Notwithstanding any other provision of law, the Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation shall not restore credits nor take any administrative action resulting in an inmate being placed in a greater credit earning category that would result in notification being provided less than 60 days prior to an inmate's scheduled release date. (3) When notification cannot be provided at least 60 days prior to release due to the unanticipated release date change of an inmate as a result of an order from the court, an action by the Board of Parole Hearings, the granting of an administrative appeal, or a finding of not guilty or dismissal of a disciplinary action, that affects the sentence of the inmate, or due to a modification of the department's decision regarding the community into which the person is scheduled to be released pursuant to paragraph (4), the department shall provide notification as soon as practicable, but in no case shall the department delay making the notification more than 24 hours from the time the final decision is made regarding where the parolee will be released. (4) Those agencies receiving the notice referred to in this subdivision may provide written comment to the board or department regarding the impending release. Agencies that choose to provide written comments shall respond within 45 days prior to the inmate's scheduled release, unless an agency received less than 60 days' notice of the impending release, in which case the agency shall respond as soon as practicable prior to the scheduled release. Those comments shall be considered by the board or department which may, based on those comments, modify its decision regarding the community in which the person is scheduled to be released. The Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation shall respond in writing not less than 15 days prior to the scheduled release with a final determination as to whether to adjust the parole location and documenting the basis for its decision, unless the department received comments less than 45 days prior to the impending release, in which case the department shall respond as soon as practicable and prior to the scheduled release. The comments shall become a part of the inmate's file. (c) If the court orders the immediate release of an inmate, the department shall notify the sheriff or chief of police, or both, and the district attorney, having jurisdiction over the community in which the person was convicted and, in addition, the sheriff or chief of police, or both, and the district attorney, having jurisdiction over the community in which the person is scheduled to be released on parole at the time of release. (d)  (1)    The notification required by this section shall be made whether or not a request has been made under Section 3058.5.  In   (2)     In  no case shall notice required by this section to the appropriate agency be later than the day of release on parole. If, after the 60-day notice is given to law enforcement and to the district attorney relating to an out-of-county placement, there is  a  change of county placement, notice to the ultimate county of placement shall be made upon the determination of the county of placement.