California 2011 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB441 Amended / Bill

Filed 06/04/2012

 BILL NUMBER: AB 441AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN SENATE JUNE 4, 2012 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY JANUARY 23, 2012 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MARCH 24, 2011 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Monning (Coauthors: Assembly Members Alejo, Bradford, Davis, and Hueso) FEBRUARY 14, 2011 An act to add  Sections   Section  14522.3  and 14522.4  to the Government Code, relating to  state  planning. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 441, as amended, Monning.  State   Transportation  planning. Existing law requires certain transportation planning activities by the Department of Transportation and by designated regional transportation planning agencies, including development of a regional transportation plan. Existing law authorizes the California Transportation Commission, in cooperation with regional agencies, to prescribe study areas for analysis and evaluation and guidelines for the preparation of a regional transportation plan. This bill would require  that  the commission  , by no later than 2014, include voluntary   to attach a summary of the policies, practices, or projects that have been employed by metropolitan planning organizations that promote  health and health equity  factors, strategies, goals, and objectives in the   to the commission's next revision of specified regional transportation planning  guidelines  promulgated by the commission for the preparation of regional transportation plans  . Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS:  SECTION 1.   The Legislature finds and declares all of the following:   (a) Transportation planning has important implications for the maintenance and promotion of the health of all Californians.   (b) California faces critical problems that will shape the future of our state and its population, including, but not limited to, an aging population, climate change, and increasing health inequities. California and the nation are experiencing unprecedented levels of chronic disease, that now accounts for over 75 percent of all deaths in California and 75 percent of health care expenditures in the United States. The health of California's population is largely determined by the social, physical, and economic environments where people live, work, and are active, as well as their opportunities and resources for health.   (c) Local cities, counties, and some metropolitan planning organizations and regional transportation planning agencies, have adopted groundbreaking and innovative transportation plans, strategies, and goals that can serve as models for other cities and counties, as well as the state, in transportation planning and development that promotes the health and well-being of all residents.   (d) The Legislature intends that projects, programs, and practices that promote health and health equity in regional transportation plans that are employed by metropolitan planning organizations be shared in the voluntary state guidance on regional transportation planning. The Legislature, however, acknowledges that projects, programs, or policies that have been feasible in one region may not be feasible in other regions.   SECTION 1.   SEC. 2.  Section 14522.3 is added to the Government Code, to read: 14522.3. The commission shall  , in consultation with the appropriate state agencies and departments as needed, include voluntary health and health equity factors, strategies, goals, and objectives in the guidelines prescribed by the commission for the preparation of the regional transportation plans   include in an attachment to the next revision of its guidelines prescribed  pursuant to Section  14522. The commission shall include the voluntary health and health equity factors, strategies, goals, and objectives in the next revision of the guidelines.   14522 a summary of the policies, practices, or projects that have been employed by metropolitan planning organizations that promote health and health equity. The summary attachment may include, but is not limited to, projects that implement any Safe Routes to Schools program, established pursuant to Section 2333.5 of the Streets and Highways Code, multiuse recreational trails, pedestrian and bicyclist pathways, and programs that serve transportation needs in rural communities.  All matter omitted in this version of the bill appears in the bill as amended in the Assembly, January 23, 2012. (JR11)