California 2011 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB455 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 07/06/2011

 BILL NUMBER: AB 455ENROLLED BILL TEXT PASSED THE SENATE JULY 5, 2011 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY APRIL 7, 2011 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MARCH 31, 2011 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Campos FEBRUARY 15, 2011 An act to add Section 3507.7 to the Government Code, relating to public employment. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 455, Campos. Public employment: local public employee organizations. The Meyers-Milias-Brown Act contains various provisions that provide methods for local public employers and their employees to resolve disputes regarding wages, hours, and other terms and conditions of employment. This bill would additionally provide that when a local public agency has established a personnel commission or merit commission to administer personnel rules or a merit system, the governing board of the public agency would appoint 1/2 of the members of the commission, and 1/2 of the members of the commission, nominated by the recognized employee organization, would be appointed by the governing board of the public agency. Whenever multiple bargaining units are represented by different recognized employee organizations, the employee organization representing the largest number of employees would designate commission members pursuant to that provision. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 3507.7 is added to the Government Code, to read: 3507.7. (a) When a public agency has established a personnel commission or merit commission to administer personnel rules or a merit system, the governing board of the public agency shall appoint one-half of the members of the commission, and one-half of the members of the commission, nominated by the recognized employee organization, shall be appointed by the governing board of the public agency. Whenever multiple bargaining units are represented by different recognized employee organizations, the employee organization representing the largest number of employees shall be the one empowered to designate commission members pursuant to this section. (b) The commission members selected under subdivision (a) shall elect jointly one additional member of the commission, who will act as chairperson of the commission.