California 2011 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB525 Amended / Bill

Filed 04/25/2011

 BILL NUMBER: AB 525AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 25, 2011 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Gordon FEBRUARY 15, 2011 An act to amend Section 42885.5 of, and to add and repeal Section 42872.5 of, the Public Resources Code, relating to solid waste. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 525, as amended, Gordon. Solid waste: tire recycling. The California Tire Recycling Act imposes a California tire fee on a new tire purchased in the state. The revenue generated from the fee is deposited in the California Tire Recycling Management Fund for expenditure, upon appropriation by the Legislature, for the purposes of programs related to waste tires, including grants to local entities involved in activities that result in reduced landfill disposal of used whole tires. The act requires the Department of Resources Recycling and Recovery to adopt a 5-year plan, which is to be updated biennially, to establish goals and priorities for waste tire programs. This bill would require the department to provide outreach to local agencies regarding a program it may establish under existing law to award grants to cities, counties, and other local government agencies for the funding of public works projects that use waste tires  in public works projects  . The bill would  prohibit   require  the amount appropriated for this purpose from the fund to not be less than  an unspecified percent   16%  of the amount of the funds appropriated for market development and new technology activities for used tires and waste tires. The bill would make the public works waste tire grant program inoperative on June 30, 2015, and would repeal the provision authorizing this program on January 1, 2016. The bill would also make conforming changes with regard to the department's 5-year plan. Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 42872.5 is added to the Public Resources Code, to read: 42872.5. (a) The grants awarded pursuant to Section 42872 may be made to cities, counties, and other local government agencies for the funding of public works projects that use waste tires, including, but not limited to, the use of rubberized asphalt concrete and tire-derived aggregate. (b) The grants described in subdivision (a) shall be funded by an appropriation in the annual Budget Act from the California Tire Recycling Management Fund established pursuant to Section 42885. To the extent possible, depending on the number of qualified applications, the amount of the funds appropriated in the annual Budget Act for purposes of this section shall not be less than  ___   16  percent of the amount of the funds appropriated pursuant to this chapter, in accordance with paragraph (4) of subdivision (b) of Section 42885.5, for market development and new technology activities for used tires and waste tires. (c) In order to provide outreach to local agencies regarding the use of rubberized asphalt concrete in public works projects, all of the following shall occur: (1) The department shall create, annually update, and post on its Internet Web site a database of public works projects that use waste tires that were completed by local agencies receiving grants for purposes of this section. (2) The Department of Transportation shall post on its public Internet Web site data and descriptions regarding state public works projects using waste tires. (3) The department shall post on its public Internet Web site a link to the data and descriptions provided under paragraph (2). (4) The department shall provide technical support to local agencies on the design and application for using waste tires in public works projects. (d) This section shall become inoperative on June 30, 2015, and, as of January 1, 2016, is repealed, unless a later enacted statute, that becomes operative on or before January 1, 2016, deletes or extends the dates on which it becomes inoperative and is repealed. SEC. 2. Section 42885.5 of the Public Resources Code is amended to read: 42885.5. (a) The department shall adopt a five-year plan, which shall be updated every two years, to establish goals and priorities for the waste tire program and each program element. (b) On or before July 1, 2001, and every two years thereafter, the department shall submit the adopted five-year plan to the appropriate policy and fiscal committees of the Legislature. The department shall include in the plan, programmatic and fiscal issues including, but not limited to, the hierarchy used by the department to maximize productive uses of waste and used tires, and the performance objectives and measurement criteria used by the department to evaluate the success of its waste and used tire recycling program. Additionally, the plan shall describe each program element's effectiveness, based upon performance measures developed by the department, including, but not limited to, the following: (1) Enforcement and regulations relating to the storage of waste and used tires. (2) Cleanup, abatement, or other remedial action related to waste tire stockpiles throughout the state. (3) Research directed at promoting and developing alternatives to the landfill disposal of waste tires. (4) Market development and new technology activities for used tires and waste tires. (5) The waste and used tire hauler program and manifest system. (6) A description of the grants, loans, contracts, and other expenditures proposed to be made by the department under the tire recycling program. (7) Until June 30, 2015, the grant program authorized under Section 42872.5 to encourage the use of waste tires, including, but not limited to, rubberized asphalt concrete technology, in public works projects. (8) Border region activities, conducted in coordination with the California Environmental Protection Agency, including, but not limited to, all of the following: (A) Training programs to assist Mexican waste and used tire haulers to meet the requirements for hauling those tires in California. (B) Environmental education training. (C) Development of a waste tire abatement plan, with the appropriate government entities of California and Mexico. (D) Tracking both the legal and illegal waste and used tire flow across the border and recommended revisions to the waste tire policies of California and Mexico. (E) Coordination with businesses operating in the border region and with Mexico, with regard to applying the same environmental and control requirements throughout the border region. (F) Development of projects in Mexico in the California-Mexico border region, as defined by the La Paz Agreement, that include, but are not limited to, education, infrastructure, mitigation, cleanup, prevention, reuse, and recycling projects, that address the movement of used tires from California to Mexico that are eventually disposed of in California. (c) The department shall base the budget for the California Tire Recycling Act and program funding on the plan. (d) The plan may not propose financial or other support that promotes, or provides for research for the incineration of tires.