California 2011 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB580 Amended / Bill

Filed 06/28/2012

 BILL NUMBER: AB 580AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN SENATE JUNE 28, 2012 AMENDED IN SENATE JUNE 26, 2012 AMENDED IN SENATE JUNE 12, 2012 AMENDED IN SENATE AUGUST 15, 2011 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Davis FEBRUARY 16, 2011 An act to amend Section 60200.6 of the Education Code, relating to pupil instruction. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 580, as amended, Davis. Pupil instruction: curriculum: civil rights. Existing law requires the State Board of Education to adopt at least 5 basic instructional materials in specified subject areas, including social science, for use in kindergarten and grades 1 to 8, inclusive. A provision of existing law requires instructional materials adopted for social science to include, among other things, information designed to instruct pupils on the civil rights movement. This bill would  authorize   require  the state board to develop a social science curriculum pursuant to that provision, as specified. Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 60200.6 of the Education Code is amended to read: 60200.6. (a) Instructional materials adopted pursuant to this chapter for the category of social science as specified in paragraph (4) of subdivision (a) of Section 60200 shall include information designed to instruct pupils on Dr. Martin Luther King, Jr., the civil rights movement, and contributions made by ethnic minority groups to the history of the United States. The state board shall ensure that the materials present the information in a manner consistent with the instruction provided in each grade level. The state board shall endeavor to see that this objective is accomplished in the evaluation of instructional materials for educational content. (b) The curriculum developed pursuant to this section  may   shall  include, but not necessarily be limited to, all of the following: (1) Issues related to social justice, power relations, diversity, mutual respect, and civic engagement. (2) The definition of civil rights and the modern civil rights movement and the tactics used by civil rights activists to achieve social change. (3) A focus on the modern civil rights era and the events that took place in the 1950s, 1960s, 1970s, and 1980s, including, but not limited to, demonstrations, resistance, organizing, nonviolent civil disobedience, and collective action and unity in the pursuit of fair and equal treatment for all Americans. (4) A review of significant court cases, legislation, organizations, events, monuments, literature, arts, and contributions of men, women, and other significant figures of the modern civil rights era.