BILL NUMBER: AB 615ENROLLED BILL TEXT PASSED THE SENATE SEPTEMBER 8, 2011 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY SEPTEMBER 8, 2011 AMENDED IN SENATE SEPTEMBER 2, 2011 AMENDED IN SENATE AUGUST 31, 2011 AMENDED IN SENATE JULY 13, 2011 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 28, 2011 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 25, 2011 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Bonnie Lowenthal (Coauthor: Assembly Member Perea) FEBRUARY 16, 2011 An act relating to high-speed rail, and making an appropriation therefor. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 615, Bonnie Lowenthal. High-speed rail. Existing law creates the High-Speed Rail Authority with specified powers and duties relative to development and implementation of a high-speed train system. Existing law, pursuant to the Safe, Reliable High-Speed Passenger Train Bond Act for the 21st Century, approved by the voters as Proposition 1A at the November 4, 2008, general election, provides for the issuance of $9.95 billion for high-speed train capital projects and other associated purposes. The Budget Act of 2011 appropriates various amounts from the High-Speed Passenger Train Bond Fund to the High-Speed Rail Authority for high-speed rail purposes on specified segments, subject to certain conditions and provisions. This bill would supplement these Budget Act appropriations by appropriating $4,000,000 from the High-Speed Passenger Train Bond Fund to the authority for the Los Angeles to San Diego segment, subject to similar conditions and provisions. Appropriation: yes. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. The sum of four million dollars ($4,000,000) is hereby appropriated from the High-Speed Passenger Train Bond Fund, to be allocated as follows: (a) (1) One million two hundred thousand dollars ($1,200,000) shall be available to supplement the amount appropriated by Item 2665-304-6043 of Section 2.00 of the Budget Act of 2011. (2) The amount provided in paragraph (1) shall be available only for the Los Angeles to San Diego segment. (3) (A) Provisions 1 to 5, inclusive, of Item 2665-304-6043 of Section 2.00 of the Budget Act of 2011 shall also apply to the amount made available by this subdivision. (B) Consistent with Provision 3 of Item 2665-304-6043 of Section 2.00 of the Budget Act of 2011, funds made available in this subdivision may be transferred and expended for the purposes of subdivision (b). These transfers shall require the prior approval of the Department of Finance. (b) (1) Two million eight hundred thousand dollars ($2,800,000) shall be available to supplement the amount appropriated by Item 2665-305-6043 of Section 2.00 of the Budget Act of 2011. (2) The amount provided in paragraph (1) shall be available only for the Los Angeles to San Diego segment. (3) (A) Provisions 1 to 6, inclusive, of Item 2665-305-6043 of Section 2.00 of the Budget Act of 2011 shall also apply to the amount made available by this subdivision. (B) Consistent with Provision 4 of Item 2665-305-6043 of Section 2.00 of the Budget Act of 2011, funds made available in this subdivision may be transferred and expended for the purposes of subdivision (a). These transfers shall require the prior approval of the Department of Finance.