BILL NUMBER: AB 670ENROLLED BILL TEXT PASSED THE SENATE JULY 14, 2011 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY MAY 31, 2011 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 28, 2011 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MARCH 29, 2011 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Block FEBRUARY 17, 2011 An act to add Section 89030.7 to the Education Code, relating to the California State University. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 670, Block. California State University: admissions. Existing law establishes the California State University as one of the segments of public postsecondary education in the state. The university includes 25 specified campuses and is administered by a board, known as the Trustees of the California State University. This bill would require the trustees to ensure that campuses meet specific requirements with respect to appeal procedures for a denial of admission. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 89030.7 is added to the Education Code, to read: 89030.7. With respect to denial of admission for an applicant, the Trustees of the California State University shall ensure for each campus of the California State University all of the following: (a) Appeal procedures that clearly set forth the following: (1) The basis for appeal. (2) A timeframe of 15 business days from the date of denial of admissions notification in which to appeal. (3) A limit of one appeal per academic term. (4) The contact information for the campus office to which an appeal is submitted. (5) A time estimate for when the campus expects to issue a response to an appeal request. (b) The campus includes the appeal procedures described in subdivision (a) in a denial of admission notification to a student. (c) The campus posts information on the campus Internet Web site that details the appeal procedures described in subdivision (a).