California 2011 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB681 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 09/20/2011

 BILL NUMBER: AB 681ENROLLED BILL TEXT PASSED THE SENATE SEPTEMBER 7, 2011 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY SEPTEMBER 8, 2011 AMENDED IN SENATE SEPTEMBER 2, 2011 AMENDED IN SENATE JULY 7, 2011 AMENDED IN SENATE JUNE 22, 2011 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Wieckowski FEBRUARY 17, 2011 An act to amend Section 25270.11 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to aboveground storage tanks. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 681, Wieckowski. Aboveground storage tanks: funds. Existing law makes the Environmental Protection Trust Fund and the training account in that fund inoperative as of July 1, 2011, and repeals the fund and account as of January 1, 2012. Until July 1, 2011, existing law authorizes the expenditure of a portion of the moneys in the Environmental Protection Trust Fund, upon appropriation by the Legislature, for purposes of a training account established and maintained by the Secretary for Environmental Protection and allocates all remaining funds to the unified program agencies for expenditure to implement the Aboveground Petroleum Storage Act. This bill would make the fund and account operative until July 1, 2013, and would repeal the fund and the account on January 1, 2014. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 25270.11 of the Health and Safety Code is amended to read: 25270.11. (a) All moneys in the Environmental Protection Trust Fund may be expended, upon appropriation by the Legislature, in the following manner: (1) A portion of the funds, in an amount determined by the secretary in consultation with the UPAs, to a training account established and maintained by the secretary, to be used for purposes of training UPA personnel in the requirements of this chapter. (2) All remaining funds in the Environmental Protection Trust Fund, shall be allocated to the UPAs, in accordance with a formula and process determined by the secretary in consultation with the UPAs. The UPAs shall expend those funds for the purpose of implementing this chapter. Eighty percent or less of each UPA's allocation may be distributed to the UPA in advance of actual expenditure by the UPA. (b) All moneys remaining in the training account established pursuant to paragraph (1) of subdivision (a), as of June 1, 2013, may be expended pursuant to paragraph (2) of subdivision (a), upon appropriation by the Legislature. (c) All moneys remaining in the Environmental Protection Trust Fund that have not been expended, as of June 1, 2013, shall be deposited into the Unified Program Account created pursuant to Section 25404.5 and expended pursuant to paragraph (2) of subdivision (a), upon appropriation by the Legislature. (d) This section shall become inoperative on July 1, 2013, and, as of January 1, 2014, is repealed, unless a later enacted statute, that becomes operative on or before January 1, 2014, deletes or extends the dates on which it becomes inoperative and is repealed.