California 2011 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB724 Amended / Bill

Filed 05/17/2011

 BILL NUMBER: AB 724AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MAY 17, 2011 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 28, 2011 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Bradford FEBRUARY 17, 2011 An act to add  and repeal  Section 2800  of   to  the Public Utilities Code, relating to utility service. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 724, as amended, Bradford. Electric and gas utility service: master-meter customers. Existing law authorizes the owner of a master-metered mobilehome park or manufactured housing community that provides gas or electric service to residents to transfer ownership and operational responsibility for its gas or electric system to the gas or electrical corporation providing service in the area in which the park or community is located, pursuant to specified transfer and cost allocation procedures. This bill would require the Public Utilities Commission, by February 1, 2012, to open an investigation or other appropriate proceeding to evaluate  and report to the Legislature, by July 1, 2013,  when an owner of a mobilehome park or manufactured housing community that provides master-metered gas or electric service to its residents of the park or community should be required to transfer responsibility for gas or electric service to the gas or electrical corporation providing service in the area in which the park or community is located, in addition to those plants, facilities, and interests in real property that the commission, in consultation with the gas or electrical corporation, determines are necessary, convenient, or cost effective to provide service.  These provisions would be repealed on January 1, 2018.  Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 2800 is added to the Public Utilities Code, to read: 2800.  (a)    By February 1, 2012, the commission shall open an investigation or other appropriate proceeding to evaluate  and report to the Legislature  when the owner of a mobilehome park or manufactured housing community that provides master-metered gas or electric service to its residents should be required to transfer responsibility for gas or electric service to the gas or electrical corporation providing service in the area in which the park or community is located, in addition to those plants, facilities, and interests in real property that the commission, in consultation with the gas or electrical corporation, determines are necessary, convenient, or cost effective to provide service.  (b) The commission shall report the plan to the Legislature no later than July 1, 2013. The report shall be submitted in compliance with Section 9795 of the Government Code.   (c) Pursuant to Section 10231.5 of the Government Code, this section is repealed on January 1, 2018.