California 2011 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB812 Amended / Bill

Filed 01/12/2012

 BILL NUMBER: AB 812AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY JANUARY 12, 2012 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY JANUARY 4, 2012 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Ma (Coauthor: Assembly Member Skinner) FEBRUARY 17, 2011 An act to add  Sections 16005 and   Section  42704 to the Public Resources Code, relating to solid waste. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 812, as amended, Ma. Solid waste:  recycled concrete:  recycled asphalt. Under existing law, it is the policy of the state to conserve and protect resources by encouraging the recycling of solid waste and the purchase of those recycled materials, including recycled concrete and rubberized asphalt concrete. Under existing law, in purchasing any materials to be used in paving or paving subbase for use by the Department of Transportation or any other state agency that provides road construction and repair services, the State Procurement Officer is required to make contracts available for those items that use recycled materials.  Existing law prohibits recycled concrete from being offered, provided, or sold to the Department of Transportation or the Department of General Services for any use unless specifically requested and approved by that department.   This bill would require the Department of Transportation and the Department of General Services to develop performance-based standard specifications and codes to allow the use of recycled and reclaimed concrete materials in minor or nonstructural concrete mixtures, at the option of the contractor. The bill also would require the Department of Transportation and the Department of General Services to develop a process to allow the consideration and acceptance of concrete mixes with recycled and reclaimed materials when proposed and demonstrated by contractors and suppliers on a project-by-project basis.  Existing law also requires the State Procurement Officer to make contracts available that use crumb rubber, unless the Director of Transportation determines that the use of the materials is not cost effective based on specified factors. This bill would  require   authorize  the Department of Transportation  , by January 1, 2014,  to  develop a standard specification that is performance based and that allows   establish specifications  for the use of  high-volume  reclaimed asphalt pavement (RAP) of up to 40% for hot mix asphalt mixes  , at the option of the contractor, unless the Director of Transportation determines that the use of the material is not practical, cost effective, or appropriate for a given application  .  The bill would require the department to submit a report to the Legislature, by March 1, 2016, on its progress, since the year 2011, toward the development and implementation of these specifications.  Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS:  SECTION 1.   Section 16005 is added to the Public Resources Code, to read: 16005. (a) The Department of Transportation and the Department of General Services shall develop performance-based standard specifications and codes to allow the use of recycled and reclaimed concrete materials in minor or nonstructural concrete mixtures, at the option of the contractor. (b) The Department of Transportation and the Department of General Services shall develop, in conjunction with stakeholders and academia, a process to allow the consideration and acceptance of concrete mixes with recycled and reclaimed materials when proposed and demonstrated by contractors and suppliers on a project-by-project basis.   SEC. 2.   SECTION 1.  Section 42704 is added to the Public Resources Code, to read: 42704.  The   (a)     On or before January 1, 2014, the  Department of Transportation  shall develop a standard specification that is performance based and that allows   may, with input from the Caltrans/Industry Rock Products Committee, establish specifications  for the use of  high-volume  reclaimed asphalt pavement (RAP) of up to 40 percent for hot mix asphalt mixes  , at the option of the contractor, unless the Director of Transportation determines that the use of the material is not practical, cost effective, or appropriate for a given application  .  (b) (1) On or before March 1, 2016, the Department of Transportation shall submit a report to the Legislature in compliance with Section 9795 of the Government Code on its progress, since the year 2011, toward the development and implementation of the specifications for reclaimed asphalt pavement, as specified in subdivision (a).   (2) This subdivision shall become inoperative on March 1, 2020, pursuant to Section 10231.5 of the Government Code.