California 2011 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB819 Amended / Bill

Filed 05/08/2012

 BILL NUMBER: AB 819AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN SENATE MAY 8, 2012 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY JANUARY 11, 2012 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY JANUARY 4, 2012 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MARCH 31, 2011 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Wieckowski FEBRUARY 17, 2011 An act to amend  Sections 890.6 and 890.8   Section 891  of the Streets and Highways Code, relating to bikeways. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 819, as amended, Wieckowski. Bikeways. Existing law requires the Department of Transportation, in cooperation with county and city governments, to establish minimum safety design criteria for the planning and construction of bikeways, and authorizes cities, counties, and local agencies to establish bikeways. Existing law requires all city, county, regional, and other local agencies responsible for the development or operation of bikeways or roadways where bicycle travel is permitted to utilize all minimum safety design criteria and uniform specifications and symbols for signs, markers, and traffic control devices established pursuant to specified provisions of existing law. This bill would require the department to establish procedures for cities, counties, and local agencies to  request approval to   be granted exceptions from the requirement to  use  nonstandard planning, design, and construction features in the construction of bikeways and roadways where bicycle travel is permitted, and nonstandard signs, markers, and traffic control devices, in each case,   those criteria and specifications  for purposes of research, experimentation,  and   testing, evaluation, or  verification. Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS:  SECTION 1.   Section 891 of the   Streets and Highways Code   is amended to read:  891.  (a)    All city, county, regional, and other local agencies responsible for the development or operation of bikeways or roadways where bicycle travel is permitted shall utilize all minimum safety design criteria and uniform specifications and symbols for signs, markers, and traffic control devices established pursuant to Sections 890.6 and 890.8  , except as provided in subdivision (b)  .  (b) The department shall establish procedures to permit exceptions to the requirements of subdivision (a) for purposes of research, experimentation, testing, evaluation, or verification.   SECTION 1.   Section 890.6 of the Streets and Highways Code is amended to read: 890.6. (a) The department, in cooperation with county and city governments, shall establish minimum safety design criteria for the planning and construction of bikeways and roadways where bicycle travel is permitted. The criteria shall include, but not be limited to, the design speed of the facility, minimum widths and clearances, grade, radius of curvature, pavement surface, actuation of automatic traffic control devices, drainage, and general safety. The criteria shall be updated biennially, or more often, as needed. (b) The department shall establish procedures for cities, counties, and local agencies to request approval to use nonstandard planning, design, and construction features in the construction of bikeways and roadways where bicycle travel is permitted, for purposes of research, experimentation, and verification.   SEC. 2.   Section 890.8 of the Streets and Highways Code is amended to read: 890.8. (a) The department shall establish uniform specifications and symbols for signs, markers, and traffic control devices to designate bikeways, regulate traffic, improve safety and convenience for bicyclists, and alert pedestrians and motorists of the presence of bicyclists on bikeways and on roadways where bicycle travel is permitted. (b) The department shall establish procedures for cities, counties, and local agencies to request approval to use nonstandard signs, markers, and traffic control devices on bikeways and roadways where bicycle travel is permitted, for purposes of research, experimentation, and verification.