California 2011 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB851 Amended / Bill

Filed 03/14/2011

 BILL NUMBER: AB 851AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MARCH 14, 2011 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Nestande FEBRUARY 17, 2011 An act to add and repeal Section 66942 of the Education Code, relating to public postsecondary education. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 851, as amended, Nestande. Distance learning. Existing law establishes the various segments of the public higher education system in the state. These segments include the University of California, which is administered by the Regents of the University of California, the California State University, which is administered by the Trustees of the California State University, and the California Community Colleges, which is administered by the Board of Governors of the California Community Colleges. This bill would require  that by January 1, 2014   ,   and every 2 years thereafter,  the California State University and the Board of Governors of the California Community Colleges, and request the University of California  to  ,  to  report to the Legislature on workload and key performance data on distance learning courses, as defined. The bill would require the California Virtual Campus and the California State University  by July 1, 2012, and updated   one   year thereafter,  to report to the Legislature on the California Online Program Planner project. The bill would require the Board of Governors of the California Community Colleges and the California State University to report to the Legislature  by January 1, 2013,  on the feasibility of developing  an  accelerated  bachelors's   associate's and bachelor's  degree completion  program   programs  consisting of distance learning courses, aimed at students who started college but never obtained a degree.  This bill would   ,   by November 1, 2011, also require the Legislative Analyst   's Office   to convene a task force   composed of members of the Legislature and members of the administration to identify the steps needed to establish the Western Governors University, California. The task force would, by November 1, 2012, be required to report their findings and recommendations to the Legislature.  These provisions would be repealed on January 1, 2018. Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 66942 is added to the Education Code, to read: 66942. (a) As used in this section, "distance learning course" means a course where a majority of the instruction is delivered by the Internet, television, or other means in which the student and instructor are in different locations and instruction is delivered through the use of technology. (b) (1) By January 1, 2014, and every two years thereafter, the California State University and the Board of Governors of the California Community Colleges shall, and the University of California is requested to, report to the Legislature on workload and key performance data on distance learning courses, including, but not limited to, all of the following: (A) The number of students enrolled in a distance learning course at each campus, categorized by type of delivery method for the distance learning course. (B) Completion rates for distance learning courses. (C) Program completion rates for degree programs that include exclusively distance learning courses. (2) Student enrollment and completion rate data included in a report to be submitted pursuant to this subdivision shall be made available by demographics such as age, gender, and ethnicity. (c) By July 1, 2012, the California Virtual Campus and the California State University shall report to the Legislature on the California Online Program Planner project, which will provide students, beginning with students in the San Francisco Bay area, a single online source to enroll in distance learning courses and will provide other collaborative efficiencies. An updated report shall be provided on July 1, 2013. (d) By January 1, 2013, the Board of Governors of the California Community Colleges and the California State University shall report to the Legislature on the feasibility of developing  an  accelerated  associate's and  bachelor's degree completion  program   programs  consisting of distance learning courses, aimed at students who started college but never obtained a degree.  (e) (1) By November 1, 2011, the Legislative Analyst shall convene a task force composed of members of the Legislature and members of the administration to identify the steps needed to establish the Western Governors University, California.   (2) By November 1, 2012, the task force convened pursuant to this subdivision shall report to the Legislature on the findings and recommendations of the task force.   (e) (1) A report   (f)     (1)     All reports  to be submitted pursuant to this section shall be submitted in compliance with Section 9795 of the Government Code. (2) Pursuant to Section 10231.5 of the Government Code, this section is repealed on January 1, 2018.