California 2011 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB851 Amended / Bill

Filed 04/25/2011

 BILL NUMBER: AB 851AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 25, 2011 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MARCH 14, 2011 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Nestande  (   Coauthors:   Assembly Members   Blumenfield,   Garrick,   and Jeffries   )  FEBRUARY 17, 2011 An act to add and repeal Section 66942 of the Education Code, relating to public postsecondary education. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 851, as amended, Nestande. Distance learning. Existing law establishes the various segments of the public higher education system in the state. These segments include the University of California, which is administered by the Regents of the University of California, the California State University, which is administered by the Trustees of the California State University, and the California Community Colleges, which is administered by the Board of Governors of the California Community Colleges. This bill would require that by January 1, 2014, and every 2 years thereafter, the  Trustees of the  California State University and the Board of Governors of the California Community Colleges, and request the  Regents of the  University of California, to report to the Legislature on workload and key performance data on distance learning courses, as defined.  The bill would require the California Virtual Campus and the California State University by July 1, 2012, and updated one year thereafter, to report to the Legislature on the California Online Program Planner project. The bill would require the Board of Governors of the California Community Colleges and the California State University to report to the Legislature by January 1, 2013, on the feasibility of developing accelerated associate's and bachelor's degree completion programs consisting of distance learning courses, aimed at students who started college but never obtained a degree.  This bill would, by  November 1, 2011,   February 1, 2012,  also require the Legislative Analyst's Office to convene a task force composed of  specified  members of the Legislature and members of the administration to identify the steps needed to establish the Western Governors University, California.  The task force would be required to consult with representatives of the University of California, the California State University, the California Community Colleges, and the California Postsecondary Education Commission.  The task force would, by  November 1, 2012   February 1, 2013  , be required to report their findings and recommendations to the Legislature. These provisions would be repealed on January 1, 2018.  The bill would state the intent of the Legislature relating to the Western Governors University, California, as a degree-granting institution that is self-supporting and does not receive state funding.  Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 66942 is added to the Education Code, to read: 66942. (a)  As used in this section,   For purposes of data collection and reporting by the California Community Colleges, the California State University, and the University of California,  "distance learning course" means a course  where   conducted with  a majority of the  instruction is delivered by the Internet, television, or other means in which the student and instructor   instructional content delivered when faculty and students  are in different locations and instruction is delivered through the use of technology. (b) (1) By January 1, 2014, and every two years thereafter, the  Trustees of the  California State University and the Board of Governors of the California Community Colleges shall, and the  Regents of the  University of California  is   are  requested to, report to the Legislature on workload and key performance data on distance learning courses, including, but not limited to, all of the following: (A) The number of students enrolled in a distance learning course at each campus, categorized by type of delivery method for the distance learning course. (B) Completion rates for distance learning courses. (C) Program completion rates for degree programs that include exclusively distance learning courses. (2) Student enrollment and completion rate data included in a report to be submitted pursuant to this subdivision shall be made available by demographics such as age, gender, and ethnicity.  (c) By July 1, 2012, the California Virtual Campus and the California State University shall report to the Legislature on the California Online Program Planner project, which will provide students, beginning with students in the San Francisco Bay area, a single online source to enroll in distance learning courses and will provide other collaborative efficiencies. An updated report shall be provided on July 1, 2013.   (d) By January 1, 2013, the Board of Governors of the California Community Colleges and the California State University shall report to the Legislature on the feasibility of developing accelerated associate's and bachelor's degree completion programs consisting of distance learning courses, aimed at students who started college but never obtained a degree.   (e)   (c)  (1) By  November 1, 2011,   February 1, 2012,  the Legislative Analyst shall convene a task force composed of members of the Legislature  and   ,  members of the administration  , and representatives of the Western Association of Schools and Colleges  to identify the steps needed to establish the Western Governors University, California.  The task force shall consult with representatives of the University of California, the California State University, the California Community Colleges, and the California Postsecondary Education Commission.   (2) It is the intent of the Legislature that the task force evaluate the establishment of the Western Governors University, California, as a degree-granting institution that is self-supporting and that does not receive state funding. This provision is not intended to preclude the task force from evaluating the Western Governors University, California, as a potential qualifying institution for the purposes of California's student financial aid programs.   (2)   (3)  By  November 1, 2012,  February 1, 2013,  the task force convened pursuant to this subdivision shall report to the Legislature on the findings and recommendations of the task force.  (f)   (d)  (1) All reports to be submitted pursuant to this section shall be submitted in compliance with Section 9795 of the Government Code. (2) Pursuant to Section 10231.5 of the Government Code, this section is repealed on January 1, 2018.