California 2011 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB966 Chaptered / Bill

Filed 07/25/2011

 BILL NUMBER: AB 966CHAPTERED BILL TEXT CHAPTER 111 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE JULY 25, 2011 APPROVED BY GOVERNOR JULY 25, 2011 PASSED THE SENATE JULY 1, 2011 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY JULY 7, 2011 AMENDED IN SENATE JUNE 13, 2011 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MAY 9, 2011 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 28, 2011 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Yamada FEBRUARY 18, 2011 An act to add Section 9063.7 to the Health and Safety Code, relating to cemetery districts. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 966, Yamada. Public cemetery districts: nonresident burial. The Public Cemetery District Law specifies the procedures for the formation of public cemetery districts, procedures for the selection of the district board of trustees and officers, and the powers and duties of the board. That law limits interments in public cemetery district cemeteries to residents of the district and nonresidents who meet specified criteria. This bill would allow the Davis Cemetery District to inter, in a specified section of the cemetery, nonresidents if specified conditions are met. This bill would make legislative findings and declarations as to the necessity of a special statute for Davis Cemetery District. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 9063.7 is added to the Health and Safety Code, to read: 9063.7. Notwithstanding Section 9060, the Davis Cemetery District may use its cemetery at 820 Pole Line Road, Davis, for up to a total of 500 interments, for interment in the ground of any person who is not a resident or a property taxpayer of the district if all of the following apply: (a) The board of trustees determines that the cemetery has adequate space for the foreseeable future. (b) The district has an endowment care fund that requires at least the minimum payment set pursuant to Section 9065. (c) The district requires the payment of a nonresident fee set pursuant to Section 9068. SEC. 2. The Legislature finds and declares that a special law is necessary and that a general law cannot be made applicable within the meaning of Section 16 of Article IV of the California Constitution because of the unique disparity between the population of the Davis Cemetery District and the availability of cemetery plots.