BILL NUMBER: AB 970AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY JUNE 1, 2011 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MAY 27, 2011 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Fong FEBRUARY 18, 2011An act relating to student financial aid.An act to add Section 66025.1 to the Education Code, relating to postsecondary education. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 970, as amended, Fong.StudentSystemwide student fees: student financial aid:report. (1) Existing law, known as the Donahoe Higher Education Act, sets forth the missions and functions of the segments of public postsecondary education in the state. The California State University, which is governed by the Trustees of the California State University, and the University of California, which is governed by the Regents of the University of California, are 2 of the segments of public postsecondary education. The provisions of the Donahoe Higher Education Act apply to the University of California only to the extent that the Regents of the University of California act by resolution to make them applicable. Under existing law, the California State University and the University of California are authorized to charge fees to students attending their respective institutions. This bill would add a provision to the Donahoe Higher Education Act requiring any systemwide fees charged to resident students at the California State University and the University of California to be known, and referred to, as "systemwide fees" or "fees," and would provide that these fees shall not be known or referred to as "tuition." The bill would require references to those fees in any policies, rules, or regulations of the California State University and the University of California to be consistent with the requirement that the fees be known and referred to as "fees" and not "tuition."Existing(2) Existing law establishes various student financial aid programs under the administration of the Student Aid Commission, and establishes eligibility requirements for the receipt of awards under those programs for participating students attending qualifying institutions. This bill would require the commission, no later than July 31, 2012, to provide a report to the Legislature that details the policies and interactions between various state and federal financial aid programs, including the interaction between systemwide and campus-based student fees, institutional financial aid at the University of California and the California State University, Cal Grants, and federal financial aid programs. Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. (a) It is the intent of the Legislature that financially needy students be able to access public colleges and universities. (b) No later than July 31, 2012, the Student Aid Commission shall provide a report to the Legislature that details the policies and interactions between the various state and federal financial aid programs, including the interaction between systemwide and campus-based student fees, institutional financial aid at the University of California and the California State University, Cal Grants, and federal financial aid programs. (c) A report submitted pursuant to subdivision (b) shall be submitted in compliance with Section 9795 of the Government Code. (d) This section is inoperative on January 1, 2016, pursuant to Section 10231.5 of the Government Code. SEC. 2. Section 66025.1 is added to the Education Code , to read: 66025.1. (a) Any systemwide fees charged to resident students at the California State University and the University of California shall be known, and shall be referred to, as "systemwide fees" or "fees" and shall not be known or referred to as "tuition." (b) All references to systemwide fees charged to resident students by the California State University and the University of California, including references in any policies, rules, or regulations of those institutions, shall be consistent with subdivision (a).