California 2011 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB989 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 09/08/2011

 BILL NUMBER: AB 989ENROLLED BILL TEXT PASSED THE SENATE SEPTEMBER 1, 2011 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY SEPTEMBER 2, 2011 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MAY 27, 2011 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MARCH 21, 2011 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Mitchell (Coauthors: Assembly Members Ammiano, Blumenfield, Bonilla, Bonnie Lowenthal, Portantino, and Williams) (Coauthor: Senator Correa) FEBRUARY 18, 2011 An act to amend Section 5847 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to mental health. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 989, Mitchell. Mental health: children's services. Existing law contains provisions governing the operation and financing of community mental health services for the mentally disordered in every county through locally administered and locally controlled community mental health programs. Existing law, the Mental Health Services Act, an initiative measure enacted by the voters as Proposition 63 at the November 2, 2004, statewide general election, establishes the Mental Health Services Fund to fund various county mental health programs. The act provides that it may be amended by the Legislature by a 2/3 vote of each house as long as the amendment is consistent with and furthers the intent of the act, and that the Legislature may also clarify procedures and terms of the act by majority vote. Existing law requires each county mental health program to prepare and submit a 3-year plan that includes information on specified programs, including, but not limited to, programs for services to children and adults, and requires these programs to provide services to address the needs of transition age youth 16 to 25 years of age. This bill would require county mental health programs, in providing for services for transition age youth, to consider the needs of transition age foster youth. This bill would declare that it clarifies procedures and terms of the act. Because this bill would require counties to consider the needs of transition age foster youth in connection with programs for children and adults, it would impose a state-mandated local program. The California Constitution requires the state to reimburse local agencies and school districts for certain costs mandated by the state. Statutory provisions establish procedures for making that reimbursement. This bill would provide that no reimbursement is required by this act for a specified reason. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 5847 of the Welfare and Institutions Code is amended to read: 5847. Integrated Plans for Prevention, Innovation, and System of Care Services. (a) It is the intent of the Legislature to streamline the approval processes of the State Department of Mental Health and the Mental Health Services Oversight and Accountability Commission of programs developed pursuant to Sections 5891 and 5892. (b) Each county mental health program shall prepare and submit a three-year plan. The plan shall include all of the following: (1) A program for prevention and early intervention in accordance with Part 3.6 (commencing with Section 5840). (2) A program for services to children in accordance with Part 4 (commencing with Section 5850), to include a program pursuant to Chapter 4 (commencing with Section 18250) of Part 6 of Division 9 or provide substantial evidence that it is not feasible to establish a wraparound program in that county. (3) A program for services to adults and seniors in accordance with Part 3 (commencing with Section 5800). (4) A program for innovations in accordance with Part 3.2 (commencing with Section 5830). (5) A program for technological needs and capital facilities needed to provide services pursuant to Part 3 (commencing with Section 5800), Part 3.6 (commencing with Section 5840), and Part 4 (commencing with Section 5850). All plans for proposed facilities with restrictive settings shall demonstrate that the needs of the people to be served cannot be met in a less restrictive or more integrated setting. (6) Identification of shortages in personnel to provide services pursuant to the above programs and the additional assistance needed from the education and training programs established pursuant to Part 3.1 (commencing with Section 5820). (7) Establishment and maintenance of a prudent reserve to ensure the county program will continue to be able to serve children, adults, and seniors that it is currently serving pursuant to Part 3 (commencing with Section 5800), the Adult and Older Adult Mental Health System of Care Act, Part 3.6 (commencing with Section 5840), Prevention and Early Intervention Programs, and Part 4 (commencing with Section 5850), the Children's Mental Health Services Act, during years in which revenues for the Mental Health Services Fund are below recent averages adjusted by changes in the state population and the California Consumer Price Index. (c) The State Department of Mental Health shall not issue guidelines for the Integrated Plans for Prevention, Innovation, and System of Care Services before January 1, 2012. (d) The programs established pursuant to paragraphs (2) and (3) of subdivision (b) shall include services to address the needs of transition age youth ages 16 to 25. In implementing this subdivision, county mental health programs shall consider the needs of transition age foster youth. (e) Each year the State Department of Mental Health, in consultation with the California Mental Health Directors Association, the Mental Health Services Oversight and Accountability Commission, and the Mental Health Planning Council, shall inform counties of the amounts of funds available for services to children pursuant to Part 4 (commencing with Section 5850), and to adults and seniors pursuant to Part 3 (commencing with Section 5800). Each county mental health program shall prepare expenditure plans pursuant to Part 3 (commencing with Section 5800), and Part 4 (commencing with Section 5850), and updates to the plans developed pursuant to this section. Each expenditure update shall indicate the number of children, adults, and seniors to be served pursuant to Part 3 (commencing with Section 5800), and Part 4 (commencing with Section 5850), and the cost per person. The expenditure update shall include utilization of unspent funds allocated in the previous year and the proposed expenditure for the same purpose. (f) A county mental health program shall include an allocation of funds from a reserve established pursuant to paragraph (7) of subdivision (b) for services pursuant to paragraphs (2) and (3) of subdivision (b) in years in which the allocation of funds for services pursuant to subdivision (e) are not adequate to continue to serve the same number of individuals as the county had been serving in the previous fiscal year. SEC. 2. The Legislature finds and declares that this measure clarifies procedures and terms of the Mental Health Services Act within the meaning of Section 18 of the act. SEC. 3. No reimbursement is required by this act pursuant to Section 6 of Article XIII B of the California Constitution because the local agency receives funds from the Mental Health Services Fund for this purpose pursuant to Proposition 63, an initiative measure approved by the voters at the November 2, 2004, general election.