California 2011 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill ACA6 Amended / Bill

Filed 05/19/2011

 BILL NUMBER: ACA 6AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MAY 19, 2011 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MAY 10, 2011 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 14, 2011 INTRODUCED BY Assembly  Member   Gatto   Members   Gatto   and Feuer  (Principal coauthor: Senator Pavley) (Coauthors: Assembly Members Blumenfield, Gordon, Gorell, Hayashi, Huffman, Bonnie Lowenthal, Mendoza, Olsen, Smyth, and Solorio) (Coauthor: Senator De Len) DECEMBER 6, 2010 A resolution to propose to the people of the State of California an amendment to the Constitution of the State, by amending Section 8 of Article II thereof, relating to initiatives. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST ACA 6, as amended, Gatto. Initiative measures: funding source. The California Constitution provides that the electors may propose statutes or amendments to the state constitution through the initiative process by presenting to the Secretary of State a petition that sets forth the text of the proposed statute or amendment to the Constitution and is certified to have been signed by a certain number of electors. This measure would prohibit an initiative measure that would result in a net increase in state or local government costs exceeding  $3,000,000   $5,000,000  , other than costs attributable to the issuance, sale, or repayment of bonds, from being submitted to the electors or having any effect unless and until the Legislative Analyst and the Director of Finance jointly determine that the initiative measure provides for additional revenues in an amount that meets or exceeds the net increase in costs. Vote: 2/3. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. Resolved by the Assembly, the Senate concurring, That the Legislature of the State of California at its 2011-12 Regular Session commencing on the sixth day of December 2010, two-thirds of the membership of each house concurring, hereby proposes to the people of the State of California that the Constitution of the State be amended as follows: That Section 8 of Article II thereof is amended to read: SEC. 8. (a) The initiative is the power of the electors to propose statutes and amendments to the Constitution and to adopt or reject them. (b) An initiative measure may be proposed by presenting to the Secretary of State a petition that sets forth the text of the proposed statute or amendment to the Constitution and that is certified to have been signed by electors equal in number to 5 percent in the case of a statute, and 8 percent in the case of an amendment to the Constitution, of the votes for all candidates for Governor at the last gubernatorial election. (c) The Secretary of State shall then submit the measure at the next general election held at least 131 days after it qualifies or at any special statewide election held prior to that general election. The Governor may call a special statewide election for the measure. (d) An initiative measure embracing more than one subject may not be submitted to the electors or have any effect. (e) An initiative measure may not include or exclude any political subdivision of the State from the application or effect of its provisions based upon approval or disapproval of the initiative measure, or based upon the casting of a specified percentage of votes in favor of the measure, by the electors of that political subdivision. (f) An initiative measure may not contain alternative or cumulative provisions wherein one or more of those provisions would become law depending upon the casting of a specified percentage of votes for or against the measure. (g) An initiative measure that would result in a net increase in state or local government costs exceeding  three   five  million dollars  ($3,000,000)   ($5,000,000)  , other than costs attributable to the issuance, sale, or repayment of bonds authorized by the measure, as jointly determined by the Legislative Analyst and Director of Finance, may not be submitted to the electors or have any effect unless and until the Legislative Analyst and the Director of Finance jointly determine that the initiative measure provides for additional revenues in an amount that meets or exceeds the net increase in costs.