California 2011 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill ACR115 Amended / Bill

Filed 06/04/2012

 BILL NUMBER: ACR 115AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY JUNE 4, 2012 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Wieckowski  (   Principal   coauthors:   Assembly Members   Mendoza   and Perea   )  FEBRUARY 23, 2012 Relative to India's Independence Day. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST ACR 115, as amended, Wieckowski. India's Independence Day. This measure would proclaim August 15, 2012, as India's Independence Day, and would urge all Californians to join in celebrating India's independence. Fiscal committee: no. WHEREAS, On August 15, 1947, at the stroke of midnight, the first Prime Minister of India, Jawaharlal Nehru, gave his famous Tryst with Destiny speech proclaiming India's independence; and WHEREAS, The Tryst with Destiny speech is considered to be one of the greatest speeches of all time, which captured the essence of the 100-year nonviolent Indian freedom struggle against British colonial rule in India; and WHEREAS, India's Independence Day is one of the most important national holidays in India. The biggest event of the day takes place in Delhi where the Prime Minster hoists the national flag at the Red Fort  and  ,  delivers a nationally televised speech that highlights the achievements of the government, discusses current issues and future plans for progress, and pays tribute to the leaders of India's struggle for freedom; and WHEREAS, India's Independence Day is celebrated on August 15 of each year to commemorate its independence. It is one of the most important national holidays in India, which was celebrated by 400 million Indians in 1947 and today is celebrated by a billion people living in India, and many people living in other parts of the world, including California, which is home to the largest population of Asian Indians in the United States; now, therefore, be it Resolved by the Assembly of the State of California, the Senate thereof concurring, That the Legislature hereby proclaims August 15, 2012, as India's Independence Day, and urges all Californians to join in celebrating India's independence; and be it further Resolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.