BILL NUMBER: ACR 17CHAPTERED BILL TEXT RESOLUTION CHAPTER 11 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE APRIL 6, 2011 ADOPTED IN SENATE APRIL 4, 2011 ADOPTED IN ASSEMBLY MARCH 17, 2011 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MARCH 17, 2011 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MARCH 9, 2011 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Fong (Coauthors: Assembly Members Achadjian, Alejo, Allen, Ammiano, Atkins, Beall, Bill Berryhill, Block, Blumenfield, Bonilla, Bradford, Brownley, Buchanan, Butler, Charles Calderon, Campos, Carter, Cedillo, Chesbro, Cook, Davis, Dickinson, Eng, Feuer, Fletcher, Fuentes, Furutani, Galgiani, Garrick, Gatto, Gordon, Gorell, Grove, Hagman, Hall, Harkey, Hayashi, Roger Hernndez, Hill, Huber, Hueso, Huffman, Jeffries, Jones, Lara, Logue, Bonnie Lowenthal, Ma, Mansoor, Mendoza, Miller, Mitchell, Monning, Nestande, Nielsen, Olsen, Pan, Perea, John A. Prez, V. Manuel Prez, Silva, Skinner, Solorio, Swanson, Torres, Valadao, Wagner, Wieckowski, Williams, and Yamada) FEBRUARY 8, 2011 Relative to Campus Safety Month. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST ACR 17, Fong. Campus Safety Month. This measure would declare March as Campus Safety Month, and would encourage citizens to visit the Internet Web site of the California Postsecondary Education Commission to view public safety information about public and private colleges and universities. WHEREAS, California public and private colleges and universities will serve over 2.7 million students; and WHEREAS, Approximately 200,000 public high school graduates will enroll as freshmen in California public colleges and universities; and WHEREAS, Approximately 47,000 California Community College students will transfer to a California four-year public college or university; and WHEREAS, Approximately 300,000 students will attend private colleges and universities in California; and WHEREAS, Colleges and universities are not immune to the crimes that face the rest of California; and WHEREAS, California colleges and universities reported that 29,000 crimes occurred in 2008, including 688 aggravated assaults, 479 sex offenses, 137 arson crimes, 6,300 property crimes, and 4 murders, as reported by the Postsecondary Education Commission; and WHEREAS, California colleges and universities have a responsibility to protect students and the nearby communities from violent and property crimes; and WHEREAS, Thousands of students will be applying and accepting admission to state colleges and universities; and WHEREAS, California families and students are best equipped to make informed higher education decisions when provided with timely and accurate academic and public safety information; and WHEREAS, This state should make resources available to families and students and provide public safety information regarding public colleges and universities; and WHEREAS, A coalition of rape crisis centers, known as the California Coalition Against Sexual Assault, has partnered with the California Postsecondary Education Commission, the University of California, the California State University, the California Community Colleges, and the Association of Independent California Colleges and Universities to promote safe campuses and communities; now, therefore, be it Resolved by the Assembly of the State of California, the Senate thereof concurring, That the Legislature declares March as Campus Safety Month in California; and be it further Resolved, That citizens are encouraged to visit the Internet Web site of the California Postsecondary Education Commission to view public safety information about public and private colleges and universities; and be it further Resolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit copies of this resolution to the Governor, the California State University system, the University of California system, and to the author for distribution.