California 2011 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill ACR30 Chaptered / Bill

Filed 06/12/2012

 BILL NUMBER: ACR 30CHAPTERED BILL TEXT RESOLUTION CHAPTER 50 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE JUNE 12, 2012 ADOPTED IN SENATE JUNE 7, 2012 ADOPTED IN ASSEMBLY MARCH 1, 2012 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MARCH 1, 2012 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY FEBRUARY 9, 2012 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Mendoza (Coauthors: Assembly Members Achadjian, Alejo, Allen, Ammiano, Atkins, Beall, Bill Berryhill, Block, Blumenfield, Bonilla, Bradford, Brownley, Buchanan, Butler, Campos, Carter, Cedillo, Chesbro, Conway, Cook, Dickinson, Eng, Feuer, Fong, Fuentes, Furutani, Beth Gaines, Galgiani, Garrick, Gatto, Gordon, Hagman, Halderman, Hall, Harkey, Hayashi, Roger Hernndez, Hill, Huber, Hueso, Huffman, Jeffries, Jones, Lara, Logue, Ma, Mansoor, Miller, Monning, Morrell, Nestande, Nielsen, Olsen, Pan, Perea, John A. Prez, V. Manuel Prez, Portantino, Silva, Skinner, Smyth, Solorio, Swanson, Torres, Wagner, Wieckowski, Williams, and Yamada) FEBRUARY 28, 2011 Relative to Read Across America Day. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST ACR 30, Mendoza. Read Across America Day. This measure would recognize March 2, 2012, as Read Across America Day. WHEREAS, Reading is the building block to learning, and is the foundation for future success; and WHEREAS, In 1998, the National Education Association started its "Read Across America" campaign to raise awareness about the importance of reading; and WHEREAS, The California Teachers Association celebrates "Read Across America" and the positive impact it has made in the schools and the State of California; and WHEREAS, "Read Across America" is a national celebration of reading that promotes literacy, reading, and adult involvement in the education of pupils, and is celebrated on March 2 in honor of Dr. Seuss's birthday; and WHEREAS, The theme of this year's event, "Sink Your Teeth into a Good Book," reminds children of all ages that learning to read is fun and one of the most important things they will learn to do; and WHEREAS, Pupils, parents, teachers, sports figures, celebrities, firefighters, and business and community leaders are taking part in "Read Across America" events to celebrate the joy of reading; and WHEREAS, On March 2, 2012, the National Education Association, the California Teachers Association, local schools, libraries, bookstores, businesses, and other community organizations will commemorate "Read Across America Day"; now, therefore, be it Resolved by the Assembly of the State of California, the Senate thereof concurring, That the Legislature joins the California Teachers Association in recognizing March 2, 2012, as "Read Across America Day"; and be it further Resolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.