California 2011 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill ACR37 Chaptered / Bill

Filed 07/11/2011

 BILL NUMBER: ACR 37CHAPTERED BILL TEXT RESOLUTION CHAPTER 49 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE JULY 11, 2011 ADOPTED IN SENATE JULY 1, 2011 ADOPTED IN ASSEMBLY MAY 19, 2011 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 7, 2011 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Conway MARCH 14, 2011 Relative to the CHP Officer Justin W. McGrory Memorial Highway. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST ACR 37, Conway. CHP Officer Justin W. McGrory Memorial Highway. This measure would designate a specified portion of State Highway Route 15 in the County of San Bernardino as the CHP Officer Justin W. McGrory Memorial Highway. The measure would request that the Department of Transportation determine the cost of appropriate signs showing this special designation and, upon receiving donations from nonstate sources covering that cost, to erect those signs. WHEREAS, Justin Wayne McGrory was born June 4, 1982, in Beaufort, South Carolina; and WHEREAS, Justin graduated from Silverado High School in Victorville, California, in 2000 and attended American River College in Sacramento, California; and WHEREAS, Prior to joining the California Highway Patrol (CHP), CHP Officer McGrory served in the United States Air Force in Little Rock, Arkansas. Upon discharge, he joined the Air Force Reserves at Travis Air Force Base in Fairfield, California, and was activated for a four-month tour of duty in Afghanistan in 2006; and WHEREAS, In 2007, CHP Officer McGrory, badge number 18606, graduated from the CHP Academy and was assigned to the Baldwin Park Area Office; and WHEREAS, After 18 months, CHP Officer McGrory was voluntarily transferred to the Barstow Area where he spent the remainder of his career; and WHEREAS, CHP Officer McGrory had only been a CHP Officer for a few years and did not have any collateral duties; however, because of his exceptional skills as a CHP Officer, he was scheduled to attend a field training evaluation program class to become a field training officer to train new cadets. This class took place shortly after his death; and WHEREAS, On July 15, 2008, CHP Officer McGrory married his best friend, Kelly, and had four wonderful children: Erin (born October 5, 2003), Cade (born July 7, 2005), Liam (born April 20, 2009), and Kaci (born July 20, 2010); and WHEREAS, On June 27, 2010, at approximately 3:38 a.m., CHP Officer McGrory was issuing a field sobriety test on the shoulder of the I-15 freeway when a red Pontiac G6 veered onto the shoulder and struck him; and WHEREAS, CHP Officer McGrory's partner broadcast an 11-99 (officer down) and immediately began CPR. Two other CHP officers and a sergeant arrived on the scene minutes later and assisted with CPR; and WHEREAS, CHP Officer McGrory was airlifted to Saint Mary's Regional Medical Center in Apple Valley, California, but unfortunately succumbed to his injuries at approximately 4:55 a.m.; and WHEREAS, CHP Officer McGrory loved spending time with his family and friends and enjoyed watching UFC fights, the cooking channel, and classic movies, and reciting scenes from classic mobster movies, reading Yahoo News, and instigating fights (all in fun of course). He was admired for his sense of humor, his ability to "write a citation without managing to ruin the violator's day," devotion to his family and career, confidence, charm, poise, and for being an all around great man; now, therefore, be it Resolved by the Assembly of the State of California, the Senate thereof concurring, That the Legislature hereby designates the portion of State Highway Route 15 from Wild Wash Road at milepost 55.957 to Hodge Road at milepost 60.159 in the County of San Bernardino as the CHP Officer Justin W. McGrory Memorial Highway; and be it further Resolved, That the Department of Transportation is requested to determine the costs of erecting the appropriate signs, consistent with the signing requirements for the state highway system, showing this special designation, and upon receiving donations from nonstate sources covering the cost, to erect those signs; and be it further Resolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit copies of this resolution to the Department of Transportation and to the author for appropriate distribution.