California 2011 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill ACR41 Amended / Bill

Filed 04/04/2011

 BILL NUMBER: ACR 41AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 4, 2011 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Mitchell MARCH 21, 2011 Relative to the CHP Officer Philip  D.   Dennis  Ortiz Memorial Highway. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST ACR 41, as amended, Mitchell. CHP Officer Philip  D.   Dennis  Ortiz Memorial Highway. This measure would designate a specified portion of State Highway Route 405 in the County of Los Angeles as the CHP Officer Philip  D.   Dennis  Ortiz Memorial Highway. The measure would request that the Department of Transportation determine the cost of appropriate signs showing this special designation and, upon receiving donations from nonstate sources covering that cost, to erect those signs. Fiscal committee: yes. WHEREAS, Philip Dennis Ortiz was born June 27, 1961, in Santa Monica, California; and WHEREAS, Philip  D. Ortiz  graduated from Santa Monica High School in 1979 and attended Santa Monica City College; and WHEREAS, Prior to joining the California Highway Patrol (CHP), Philip  D. Ortiz  worked for a local supermarket; however, he always had a dream of becoming a CHP Officer; and WHEREAS, On December 23,1982, CHP Officer Philip  D.   Dennis  Ortiz, badge number 10428, graduated from the CHP Academy and was assigned to the central Los Angeles area office; and WHEREAS, After more than seven years of service in the central Los Angeles area,  CHP  Officer  Philip D.  Ortiz was transferred to the west Los Angeles area, where he spent the remainder of his career; and WHEREAS,  CHP  Officer  Philip D.  Ortiz performed several duties over the course of his career, some of which included a motorcycle officer, a motorcycle officer in charge of training the officers who successfully passed motor school, a weapons/range officer, a physical methods of arrest (PMA) instructor, and protective services detail (PSD); and WHEREAS,  CHP Officer  Philip  D.   Dennis  Ortiz was married to his best friend, Jessica, in 1983, and couldn't have been happier; and WHEREAS, On June 22, 2010, CHP Officer Philip  D.   Dennis  Ortiz pulled a vehicle over for a high occupancy vehicle (HOV) lane violation. While approaching the vehicle, another car was driving along the shoulder and struck  CHP  Officer  Philip D.  Ortiz and his motorcycle; and WHEREAS,  CHP  Officer  Philip D.  Ortiz was transported to the Ronald Reagan UCLA Medical Center where he remained until his passing almost two weeks later; and WHEREAS, CHP Officer Philip  D.   Dennis  Ortiz is survived by his wife, Jessica, sister, Anna, mother, Irene, and stepfather, Claude; and WHEREAS,  CHP  Officer  Philip D.  Ortiz is admired for his professionalism, dedication, honesty, loyalty, respect, courage, and "espirit de corps." He consistently represented the best of the CHP and was an outstanding role model; now, therefore, be it Resolved by the Assembly of the State of California, the Senate thereof concurring, That the Legislature hereby designates the portion of State Highway Route 405, south of National Boulevard and north of Palms Overcrossing, milepost marker  405-LA-29.15   405-LA-29.51  to milepost marker  405-LA-29.19   405-LA-29.16  , in the County of Los Angeles as the CHP Officer Philip  D.   Dennis  Ortiz Memorial Highway; and be it further Resolved, That the Department of Transportation is requested to determine the cost of erecting the appropriate signs, consistent with the signing requirements for the state highway system, showing this special designation, and upon receiving donations from nonstate sources covering the cost, to erect those signs; and be it further Resolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit copies of this resolution to the Department of Transportation and to the author for appropriate distribution.