BILL NUMBER: ACR 42CHAPTERED BILL TEXT RESOLUTION CHAPTER 42 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE JUNE 30, 2011 ADOPTED IN SENATE JUNE 23, 2011 ADOPTED IN ASSEMBLY JUNE 27, 2011 AMENDED IN SENATE JUNE 16, 2011 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY JUNE 2, 2011 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY JUNE 1, 2011 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Members Ma and Galgiani (Coauthors: Assembly Members Achadjian, Blumenfield, Gordon, Hill, Huffman, Jeffries, Bonnie Lowenthal, Monning, Olsen, Perea, Solorio, Alejo, Allen, Ammiano, Atkins, Bill Berryhill, Block, Bonilla, Bradford, Brownley, Buchanan, Butler, Charles Calderon, Campos, Carter, Chesbro, Cook, Davis, Dickinson, Donnelly, Eng, Feuer, Fong, Fuentes, Furutani, Beth Gaines, Garrick, Gatto, Grove, Hagman, Halderman, Harkey, Huber, Hueso, Jones, Lara, Mansoor, Mitchell, Nestande, Pan, John A. Prez, Portantino, Silva, Skinner, Swanson, Torres, Valadao, Wagner, Williams, and Yamada) MARCH 21, 2011 Relative to Eat Local, Buy California Grown Day. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST ACR 42, Ma. Eat Local, Buy California Grown Day. This measure declares that Sundays are "Eat Local, Buy California Grown Day," and encourages families, restaurants, and grocers to buy California-grown floriculture, fiber, and foods. WHEREAS, California has a rich heritage and is one of the world's most prolific agricultural regions. California foods are famous for their abundance, diversity, freshness, and high quality; and WHEREAS, Buying California-grown food helps local family farmers, California food producers, and California employees and their families, contributing billions of dollars to the local economy each year; and WHEREAS, Eighty-five percent of California consumers say that it is important to them to purchase foods "grown in California" and 41 percent of California consumers say that "California grown" is more important to them today than it was a year ago; and WHEREAS, Buying locally grown California products is better for the environment. Food trucked or flown into California has a heavier carbon footprint as it travels for many days, unlike products grown just hours or minutes away; and WHEREAS, Buying California-grown food ensures a higher level of food safety and food safety standards. California strictly regulates food producers for the benefit of consumers. California products such as produce, livestock, milk, fish, floriculture, wine, dried fruits, nuts, and canned fruits and vegetables have the strictest safety and quality assurance standards of any state in the nation or world; and WHEREAS, California farmers grow more than 300 food products including livestock, poultry and seafood, produce, grains, dairy products, and wine valued at $35 billion each year; and WHEREAS, Buying California food helps ensure that family farmers will sustain their historical production systems and the valuable land that grows crops and raises livestock; and WHEREAS, In a time of economic distress for our state, the support of California products will help keep critical dollars within the state for the benefit of Californians, strengthening the state's communities, economies, and businesses. By purchasing locally produced, or produced and processed, floriculture, fiber, and food, consumers will boost local business, which in turn helps the local and state government through increased tax revenues; now, therefore, be it Resolved by the Assembly of the State of California, the Senate thereof concurring, That Sundays are hereby declared to be "Eat Local, Buy California Grown Day," and families, restaurants, and grocers are encouraged to buy California-grown floriculture, fiber, and foods, such as fresh chicken, flowers, and produce because supporting California-grown food products will result in higher food quality, improved food safety, and higher environmental and animal welfare standards, in addition to significant economic benefits; and be it further Resolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.