California 2011 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill ACR44 Amended / Bill

Filed 04/28/2011

 BILL NUMBER: ACR 44AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 28, 2011 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 26, 2011 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Members Allen and Swanson  (   Coauthors:   Assembly Members   Achadjian,   Alejo,   Ammiano,   Atkins,   Beall,   Bill Berryhill,   Block,   Blumenfield,   Bonilla,   Bradford,   Brownley,   Buchanan,   Butler,   Charles Calderon,   Campos,   Carter,   Cedillo,   Chesbro,   Conway,   Davis,   Dickinson,   Eng,   Feuer,   Fletcher,   Fong,   Furutani,   Galgiani,   Garrick,   Gatto,   Gordon,   Hagman,   Hall,   Harkey,   Hayashi,   Roger Hernndez,   Hill,  Huber,   Hueso,   Huffman,   Jeffries,   Lara,   Logue,   Bonnie Lowenthal,   Ma,   Mansoor,   Mendoza,   Mitchell,   Monning,   Morrell,   Nestande,   Nielsen,   Olsen,   Pan,   Perea,   John A. Prez,   V. Manuel Prez,   Portantino,   Silva,   Skinner,   Solorio,   Torres,   Valadao,   Wagner,   Wieckowski,  Williams,   and Yamada   )  APRIL 4, 2011 Relative to Workers Memorial Day. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST ACR 44, as amended, Allen. Workers Memorial Day. This measure would recognize April 28, 2011, as Workers Memorial Day. Fiscal committee: no. WHEREAS, Every year tens of thousands of American workers are killed by workplace accidents and occupational disease; and WHEREAS, Millions of workers are injured or made ill annually, including tens of thousands who are permanently disabled; and WHEREAS, Decades of struggle by workers, their unions, and their allies in the community have resulted in significant improvements in working conditions; and WHEREAS, Forty years ago, Congress passed the United States Occupational Safety and Health Act, promising every worker the right to a safe job; and WHEREAS, America's labor unions and their allies have fought hard to make that promise a reality, winning protections that have made jobs safer, saving hundreds of thousands of lives and preventing millions of workplace injuries and illnesses; and WHEREAS, The State of California recognizes the critical importance of the state's own Occupational Safety and Health Act and related regulations, including the necessity of the vigorous and effective enforcement of those laws; and WHEREAS, Since 1989, labor unions and their allies observe Workers Memorial Day to remember those who have suffered and died on the job, and to renew the fight for safe workplaces; and WHEREAS, April 28 was chosen because it is the anniversary of the Occupational Safety and Health Administration, and the day of a similar remembrance in Canada; and WHEREAS, Trade unions and their supporters around the world now mark April 28 as an international day of mourning; and WHEREAS, The State of California wishes to honor the hundreds of workers who are killed on the job every year in California, along with the many workers who suffer occupational injuries and illnesses in this state; and WHEREAS, Concerned Californians are determined to prevent further tragedies by renewing our efforts to seek stronger health and safety protections, better standards and enforcement, and fair and just compensation; now, therefore, be it Resolved by the Assembly of the State of California, the Senate thereof concurring, That the Members of the Legislature rededicate themselves to improving safety and health in every California workplace; and be it further Resolved, That the California Legislature hereby officially recognizes April 28, 2011, as Workers Memorial Day, in recognition of workers killed, injured, or disabled on the job; and be it further Resolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.