California 2011 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill ACR59 Chaptered / Bill

Filed 08/23/2011

 BILL NUMBER: ACR 59CHAPTERED BILL TEXT RESOLUTION CHAPTER 74 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE AUGUST 23, 2011 ADOPTED IN SENATE AUGUST 18, 2011 ADOPTED IN ASSEMBLY MAY 26, 2011 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MAY 26, 2011 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Members Atkins and V. Manuel Prez (Coauthors: Assembly Members Ma, Perea, Achadjian, Alejo, Allen, Ammiano, Beall, Bill Berryhill, Block, Blumenfield, Bonilla, Bradford, Brownley, Buchanan, Butler, Charles Calderon, Campos, Carter, Chesbro, Cook, Dickinson, Eng, Feuer, Fletcher, Fong, Fuentes, Furutani, Beth Gaines, Galgiani, Garrick, Gatto, Gordon, Grove, Hagman, Hall, Hayashi, Roger Hernndez, Hill, Huber, Hueso, Huffman, Jeffries, Lara, Bonnie Lowenthal, Mansoor, Mendoza, Miller, Mitchell, Monning, Nestande, Nielsen, Olsen, Pan, John A. Prez, Portantino, Silva, Skinner, Smyth, Solorio, Swanson, Torres, Valadao, Wagner, Wieckowski, Williams, and Yamada) MAY 11, 2011 Relative to Buy California Small Business First Month. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST ACR 59, Atkins. Buy California Small Business First Month. This measure would proclaim May 2011 as Buy California Small Business First Month. WHEREAS, The California Small Business Association established the "Buy California Small Business First" concept to educate consumers, businesses, colleges, universities, and governmental agencies about the positive economic impacts of choosing to first support California small businesses when making purchasing decisions; and WHEREAS, When consumers, businesses, colleges, universities, and governmental agencies buy from California small businesses, a wave of positive economic impacts occurs, from supporting the employment of people in the immediate community, to encouraging local entrepreneurs, to generating tax revenues from local sales and personal incomes; and WHEREAS, California's small businesses are integral to a sound economic foundation of this state because small businesses provide a majority of all private sector jobs and constantly create new employment opportunities for Californians; and WHEREAS, California's small businesses are critical to the current economic health of this state because small businesses produce more than one-half of California's gross domestic product; and WHEREAS, California's small businesses are a key factor in the future success of the state's economy because small businesses are innovative forces in the marketplace and are among those most likely to take risks to create new technologies and industries; and WHEREAS, A 2009 study conducted at California State University, Sacramento, concluded that state contracting with small businesses in California resulted in more money being distributed within the state economy than contracting with larger businesses; now, therefore, be it Resolved by the Assembly of the State of California, the Senate thereof concurring, That the Legislature proclaims May 2011 as Buy California Small Business First Month to raise awareness that when California consumers, businesses, colleges, universities, and governmental agencies choose to first support California small businesses when making purchasing decisions, a wave of positive economic impacts occurs within the state and local economies; and be it further Resolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.