BILL NUMBER: ACR 85INTRODUCED BILL TEXT INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Mendoza JANUARY 4, 2012 Relative to India Republic Day. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST ACR 85, as introduced, Mendoza. India Republic Day. This measure would proclaim January 26, 2012, as India Republic Day in the State of California. Fiscal committee: no. WHEREAS, Republic Day is one of the three national holidays of India and is celebrated every year on January 26. It was the Lahore Session of the Indian National Congress at midnight of December 31, 1929, to January 1, 1930, inclusive, that the tricolor flag was unfurled by the nationalists and a pledge was taken that on January 26 every year, "Republic Day" would be celebrated and that the people would unceasingly strive for the establishment of a sovereign democratic republic. The professed pledge was successfully redeemed on January 26, 1950, when the Constitution of India framed by the Constituent Assembly of India came into force, although independence from British rule was already achieved on August 15, 1947; and WHEREAS, Although India obtained its independence on August 15, 1947, it did not yet have a permanent constitution. Instead, its laws were based on the modified colonial Government of India Act 1935, and the country was a dominion, with George VI as head of state and Earl Mountbatten as Governor General of India. On August 28, 1947, the drafting committee was appointed to draft a permanent constitution, with Bhimrao Ramji Ambedkar as chairman. While India's Independence Day celebrates its freedom from British rule, Republic Day celebrates the coming into force of its constitution; and WHEREAS, A draft constitution was prepared by the committee and submitted to the Constituent Assembly of India on November 4, 1947. The assembly met, in sessions open to the public, for 166 days, spread over a period of two years, 11 months, and 18 days before adopting the constitution. After many deliberations and some modifications, the 308 members of the assembly signed two handwritten copies of the document, one each in Hindi and English, on January 24, 1950. Two days later, the Constitution of India became the law of all the Indian lands. The Constitution of India was passed on November 26, 1949, but it came into effect completely only on January 26, 1950. Following elections on January 21, 1950, Rajendra Prasad was elected as the President of India. The Indian National Congress and other parties had been celebrating January 26 as a symbol of independence, even before India actually became independent; and WHEREAS, Today, Republic Day is celebrated with much enthusiasm all over the country and especially in New Delhi, the capital of India where celebrations commence at the presidential level. The beginning of the occasion is always a solemn reminder of the sacrifice of the martyrs who died for the country in the freedom movement and the succeeding wars for the defense of sovereignty of the country. The president awards medals of bravery to the people from the armed forces for their exceptional courage in the field and also the civilians who have distinguished themselves by their different acts of valor in situations; and WHEREAS, To mark the importance of this occasion, every year a grand parade is held in the capital, from the Rajghat, along the Vijaypath. The different regiments of the army, the navy, and the air force march past in all their finery and official decorations. Even the horses of the cavalry are attractively caparisoned to suit the occasion. The crme of N.C.C. cadets, selected from all over the country consider it an honor to participate in this event, as do the school children from various schools in the capital. They spend many days preparing for the event and no expense is spared to see that every detail is taken care of, from their practice for the drills, the essential props, and their uniforms; and WHEREAS, The parade is followed by a pageant of spectacular displays from the different states of the country. These moving exhibits depict scenes of activities of people in those states and the music and songs of that particular state accompany each display. Each display brings out the diversity and richness of the culture of India and the whole show lends a festive air to the occasion. The parade and the ensuing pageantry is telecast by the national television and is watched by millions of viewers in every corner of the country; and WHEREAS, The patriotic fervor of the people on this day brings the whole country together even in her essential diversity. Every part of the country is represented on this occasion, which makes Republic Day the most popular of all the national holidays of India; now, therefore, be it Resolved by the Assembly of the State of California, the Senate thereof concurring, That the Legislature hereby proclaims January 26, 2012, as India Republic Day in the State of California; and be it further Resolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.