California 2011 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill ACR91 Chaptered / Bill

Filed 03/07/2012

 BILL NUMBER: ACR 91CHAPTERED BILL TEXT RESOLUTION CHAPTER 3 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE MARCH 7, 2012 ADOPTED IN SENATE MARCH 1, 2012 ADOPTED IN ASSEMBLY FEBRUARY 2, 2012 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY FEBRUARY 2, 2012 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY JANUARY 31, 2012 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Buchanan (Coauthors: Assembly Members Achadjian, Alejo, Allen, Ammiano, Atkins, Beall, Bill Berryhill, Block, Blumenfield, Bonilla, Bradford, Brownley, Butler, Campos, Carter, Cedillo, Chesbro, Conway, Cook, Dickinson, Donnelly, Eng, Feuer, Fletcher, Fong, Fuentes, Furutani, Beth Gaines, Garrick, Gatto, Gordon, Grove, Hagman, Halderman, Hall, Harkey, Roger Hernndez, Hill, Huber, Hueso, Huffman, Jeffries, Jones, Lara, Logue, Bonnie Lowenthal, Ma, Mansoor, Miller, Mitchell, Monning, Morrell, Nestande, Olsen, Pan, Perea, John A. Prez, V. Manuel Prez, Portantino, Silva, Skinner, Smyth, Swanson, Torres, Wagner, Wieckowski, and Yamada) JANUARY 18, 2012 Relative to American Heart Month and Wear Red Day. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST ACR 91, Buchanan. American Heart Month and Wear Red Day. This measure would recognize the month of February 2012 as American Heart Month in California and recognize February 3, 2012, as Wear Red Day in California. WHEREAS, Cardiovascular disease is the nation's leading cause of death and costliest disease, with direct and indirect costs estimated to be $297.7 billion dollars; and WHEREAS, Cardiovascular disease accounts for one in three deaths nationwide; and WHEREAS, Nearly 2,200 Americans die of cardiovascular disease each day, approximately one death every 39 seconds; and WHEREAS, Nearly 33 percent of deaths due to cardiovascular disease occur before the age of 75 years; and WHEREAS, In the United States, an estimated 785,000 people will have a coronary attack, an estimated 470,000 people will have a recurrent attack, and an additional 195,000 "silent" heart attacks will occur this year; and WHEREAS, Approximately 8 million women in the United States are living with heart disease, yet only one in five American women believe that heart disease is her greatest health threat; and WHEREAS, Ninety percent of women have one or more risk factors for developing heart disease; and WHEREAS, Nearly as many women die of heart disease, stroke, and all other cardiovascular diseases than the next four leading causes of death combined, including all cancers; and WHEREAS, Only 16 percent of women surveyed in 2009 identified cardiovascular disease as the greatest health problem facing them; and WHEREAS, Common symptoms for women are different than men and include pain of the jaw, arm, or back, but most women reported a delay of anywhere from 15 minutes to two weeks before seeking treatment after symptoms began; and WHEREAS, The research is clear that there are preventive strategies, as well as community-based strategies, that can increase survival rates from cardiovascular disease; and WHEREAS, February is designated as American Heart Month, and Californians should learn the warning signs of heart disease and stroke; and WHEREAS, Go Red for Women is the American Heart Association's national call to increase awareness about heart disease--the leading cause of death for women--and to inspire women to take charge of their heart health; and WHEREAS, Making the right choices relating to proper nutrition, physical activity, and other healthy lifestyle choices are essential to living a heart healthy life; and WHEREAS, Wear Red Day is recognized nationwide each year to highlight the Go Red for Women campaign; now, therefore, be it Resolved by the Assembly of the State of California, the Senate thereof concurring, That the Legislature recognizes the month of February 2012 as American Heart Month in California in order to raise awareness of the importance of the ongoing fight against heart disease and stroke; and be it further Resolved, That the Legislature recognizes February 3, 2012, as Wear Red Day in California, and urges all Californians to show their support for women and the fight against heart disease by commemorating this day by wearing the color red; and be it further Resolved, That the Legislature urges public support for Go Red for Women events planned in California during American Heart Month; and be it further Resolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.