California 2011 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AR23 Amended / Bill

Filed 03/05/2012

 BILL NUMBER: HR 23AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MARCH 5, 2012 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Hall  (   Coauthors:   Assembly Members   Achadjian,   Alejo,   Allen,   Ammiano,   Atkins,   Beall,   Block,   Bonilla,   Bradford,   Brownley,   Buchanan,   Butler,   Charles Calderon,   Campos,   Cedillo,   Chesbro,  Cook,   Davis,   Dickinson,   Donnelly,   Eng,   Feuer,   Fong,   Furutani,   Beth Gaines,   Galgiani,   Garrick,   Gatto,   Gordon,   Grove,   Hagman,  Harkey,   Hayashi,   Roger Hernndez,   Hill,   Huber,   Hueso,   Huffman,   Jeffries,   Jones,   Logue,   Bonnie Lowenthal,   Ma,   Mansoor,   Mendoza,   Mitchell,   Monning,   Nestande,   Nielsen,   Olsen,   Pan,   Perea,   John A. Prez,   V. Manuel Prez,   Portantino,   Silva,   Skinner,   Solorio,   Swanson,   Torres,   Valadao,   Wagner,   Wieckowski,   Williams,   and Yamada   )  FEBRUARY 22, 2012 Relative to Problem Gambling Awareness Week. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST HOUSE OR SENATE RESOLUTIONS DO NOT CONTAIN A DIGEST WHEREAS, The National Council on Problem Gambling has designated the week of March 4, 2012, to March 10, 2012, inclusive, as National Problem Gambling Awareness Week; and WHEREAS, Problem gambling is a public health issue affecting Californians of all ages, races, and ethnic backgrounds in all communities and has a significant societal and economic cost; and WHEREAS, Individuals, professionals, and organizations within California have come together to educate the public about the negative impacts of problem gambling behavior and to raise awareness of treatment services available locally and nationally; and WHEREAS, The Office of Problem and Pathological Gambling has trained and authorized 224 problem gambling treatment providers capable of providing counseling services throughout the state; and WHEREAS, The Office of Problem and Pathological Gambling has an Internet Web site available to the public in six languages. The office also provides self-help workbooks available in 20 languages; and WHEREAS, The Bureau of Gambling Control within the Department of Justice, the California Gambling Control Commission, the California State Lottery, the National Asian Pacific American Families Against Substance Abuse (NAPAFASA), Media Solutions, and the NICOS Chinese Health Coalition have joined the Office of Problem and Pathological Gambling within the State Department of Alcohol and Drug Programs and the California Council on Problem Gambling in a concerted effort to promote problem gambling prevention and treatment programs; now, therefore, be it Resolved by the Assembly of the State of California, That the week of March 4, 2012, to March 10, 2012, inclusive, be recognized as Problem Gambling Awareness Week and the agencies and organizations described above be commended for their concerted effort to raise public awareness of problem gambling; and be it further Resolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.