BILL NUMBER: SB 1065ENROLLED BILL TEXT PASSED THE SENATE AUGUST 31, 2012 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY AUGUST 22, 2012 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY AUGUST 6, 2012 AMENDED IN SENATE MAY 29, 2012 INTRODUCED BY Senator Kehoe FEBRUARY 13, 2012 An act relating to state claims, making an appropriation therefor, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SB 1065, Kehoe. State claims. Existing law requires the California Victim Compensation and Government Claims Board to report to the Legislature when a sufficient appropriation is not available for the payment of a claim against the state allowed by the board. This bill would appropriate $624,671.86 from the General Fund to the Executive Officer of the California Victim Compensation and Government Claims Board to pay claims accepted by the board. The bill would require the Controller, upon the request of the board, in a form prescribed by the Controller, to transfer surcharges and fees from the specified Budget Act item of appropriation identified in the bill to Item 1870-001-0001 of Section 2.00 of the Budget Act of 2012. This bill would declare that it is to take effect immediately as an urgency statute. Appropriation: yes. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. (a) The sum of six hundred twenty-four thousand six hundred seventy-one dollars and eighty-six cents ($624,671.86) is hereby appropriated from the fund specified in subdivision (b) to the Executive Officer of the California Victim Compensation and Government Claims Board for the payment of claims accepted by the board pursuant to the schedule set forth in subdivision (b). (b) Pursuant to subdivision (a), claims accepted by the California Victim Compensation and Government Claims Board shall be paid pursuant to the following schedule: Total for Fund: General ........................ Fund (0001) $593,372.28 Total for Fund: Item 2660-001-0042 Budget ...............$9,330.35 Act of 2012, Program 20.10 Total for Fund: Item 2740-001-0044 Budget ...............$3,055.15 Act of 2012, Program 11 Total for Fund: Item 4260-001-0001 Budget ...............$6,131.34 Act 2012, Program 20 Total for Fund: Item 5180-111-0001 Budget ...............$3,117.59 Act of 2012, Program 25.15 Total for Fund: Item 7100-001-0185 ...............$9,665.15 Budget Act of 2012, Program 21 SEC. 2. Upon the request of the California Victim Compensation and Government Claims Board, in a form prescribed by the Controller, the Controller shall transfer surcharges and fees from the Budget Act items of appropriation identified in subdivision (b) of Section 1 of this act to Item 1870-001-0001 of Section 2.00 of the Budget Act of 2012. For each Budget Act item of appropriation, this amount shall not exceed the cumulative total of the per claim filing fees authorized by subdivision (c) of Section 905.2 of the Government Code and the surcharge authorized by subdivision (f) of Section 905.2 of the Government Code. For those items in subdivision (b) that do not reflect a Budget Act appropriation, the Controller shall transfer an amount not to exceed the cumulative total of the per claim filing fees authorized by subdivision (c) of Section 905.2 of the Government Code and the surcharge authorized by subdivision (f) of Section 905.2 of the Government Code. This amount shall be transferred for the support of the board as reimbursements to Item 1870-001-0001 of Section 2.00 of the Budget Act of 2012. The board shall provide a report of the amounts recovered pursuant to this authority to the Department of Finance within 90 days of the enactment of this act. SEC. 3. This act is an urgency statute necessary for the immediate preservation of the public peace, health, or safety within the meaning of Article IV of the Constitution and shall go into immediate effect. The facts constituting the necessity are: In order to settle claims against the state and end hardship to claimants as quickly as possible, it is necessary for this act to take effect immediately.