California 2011 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1067 Chaptered / Bill

Filed 09/07/2012

 BILL NUMBER: SB 1067CHAPTERED BILL TEXT CHAPTER 269 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE SEPTEMBER 7, 2012 APPROVED BY GOVERNOR SEPTEMBER 7, 2012 PASSED THE SENATE MAY 21, 2012 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY AUGUST 16, 2012 AMENDED IN SENATE MAY 1, 2012 AMENDED IN SENATE APRIL 11, 2012 INTRODUCED BY Senator La Malfa (Coauthor: Senator Anderson) (Coauthor: Assembly Member Nielsen) FEBRUARY 13, 2012 An act to add Section 830.41 to the Penal Code, relating to peace officers. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SB 1067, La Malfa. Peace officers: mutual aid. Existing law authorizes any regularly employed law enforcement officer of the Oregon State Police, the Nevada Department of Motor Vehicles and Public Safety, or the Arizona Department of Public Safety to be a peace officer in this state if all of certain conditions are met, including, but not limited to, the out-of-state officer is providing law enforcement services in response to a request for services initiated by a member of the California Highway Patrol, or providing law enforcement services for the purpose of assisting a member of the California Highway Patrol, as provided, and a reciprocal operational agreement is in effect between the Department of the California Highway Patrol and the law enforcement officer's out-of-state agency. This bill would authorize the City of Tulelake, California, to enter into a mutual aid agreement with the City of Malin, Oregon, to permit their police departments to provide mutual aid to each other when necessary. The bill would require that the agreement be reviewed and approved by the Commissioner of the California Highway Patrol. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 830.41 is added to the Penal Code, to read: 830.41. Notwithstanding any other provision of law, the City of Tulelake, California is authorized to enter into a mutual aid agreement with the City of Malin, Oregon, for the purpose of permitting their police departments to provide mutual aid to each other when necessary. Before the effective date of the agreement, the agreement shall be reviewed and approved by the Commissioner of the California Highway Patrol.