California 2011 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1076 Amended / Bill

Filed 03/19/2012

 BILL NUMBER: SB 1076AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN SENATE MARCH 19, 2012 INTRODUCED BY Senator Emmerson FEBRUARY 14, 2012 An act to add and repeal Section 38568 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to air pollution. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SB 1076, as amended, Emmerson. California Global Warming Solutions Act of 2006: tire inflation regulation. The California Global Warming Solutions Act of 2006 designates the State Air Resources Board as the state agency charged with monitoring and regulating sources of emissions of greenhouse gases. The state board is required to adopt a statewide greenhouse gas emissions limit equivalent to the statewide greenhouse gas emissions level in 1990 to be achieved by 2020, and to adopt rules and regulations in an open public process to achieve the maximum technologically feasible and cost-effective greenhouse gas emission reductions. A violation of a regulation adopted by the state board pursuant to the act is subject to specified civil and criminal penalties. Pursuant to the act, the state board adopted a regulation requiring automobile service providers, by September 1, 2010, among other things, to check and inflate vehicle tires to the recommended pressure rating when performing automobile maintenance or repair services. This bill, until January 1, 2018, would require a tire pressure gauge used to meet the requirements of this regulation to be accurate within a range of plus or minus 2 pounds per square inch of pressure (2 psi). The bill, until January 1, 2018, would authorize automotive service providers to meet the requirements of the regulation without checking and inflating a vehicle's  tire   tires  if  that tire is   those tires are  determined to be  an  unsafe  tire  , as defined  , or that tire has tire age, as specified  . The bill  , until January 1, 2018,  would require the state board to adopt regulations on tire age  and safety  if the National Highway Traffic Safety Administration  publishes findings   adopts regulations  establishing a correlation between tire age and safety. Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 38568 is added to the Health and Safety Code, to read: 38568. (a) Tire pressure gauges used to meet the requirements of Section 95550 of Title 17 of the California Code of Regulations shall be accurate within a range of plus or minus two pounds per square inch of pressure (2 psi). (b) For purposes of Section 95550 of Title 17 of the California Code of Regulations, automotive service providers are not required to check and inflate a vehicle's tire   tires  if  any of the following applies:   (1)     That tire is determined to be an unsafe tire   the tires are determined to be unsafe  . As used in this subdivision, "unsafe tire" means any tire considered unsafe in accordance with standard industry practices due to tire tread wear, tread irregularity, or damage. Examples include any tire with an exposed ply or cord, a sidewall crack, a bulge, a knot, or a ply separation.  (2) (A) That tire has tire age. As used in this subdivision "tire age" means any findings published by the National Highway Traffic Safety Administration that establish a correlation between tire age and safety.   (B) If the National Highway Traffic Safety Administration does make findings establishing a correlation between tire age and safety, the state board shall adopt regulations consistent with those findings for purposes of Section 95550 of Title 17 of the California Code of Regulations.   (c) As of January 1, 2013, there is no federal, state, or industrywide adopted standard regarding tire age and safety. If the National Highway Traffic Safety Administration adopts regulations establishing a correlation between tire age and safety, the state board shall adopt regulations consistent with those federal regulations for purposes of Section 95550 of Title 17 of the California Code of Regulations.   (c)   (d)  This section shall remain in effect only until January 1, 2018, and as of that date is repealed, unless a later enacted statute, that is enacted before January 1, 2018, deletes or extends that date.