BILL NUMBER: SB 1087AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY AUGUST 22, 2012 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY AUGUST 6, 2012 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY JUNE 7, 2012 AMENDED IN SENATE APRIL 30, 2012 AMENDED IN SENATE APRIL 10, 2012 INTRODUCED BY Senator Walters FEBRUARY 15, 2012 An act to amend Section 8484.3 of the Education Code, and to amend Section 1596.793 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to organized camps. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SB 1087, as amended, Walters. Organized camps. Existing law permits a participating program operated by a city, county, or nonprofit organization in the After School Learning and Safe Neighborhoods Partnership Program to operate for up to 30 hours per week without obtaining a license or special permit otherwise required under existing law. The bill would increase the authorization to 60 hours per week, provided that an individual pupil cannot attend the program for more than 30 hours per week. Existing law regulates the licensure and administration of day care centers and family day care centers and exempts specified recreation programs conducted for children from these regulations. The bill would expand the scope of this exemption to organizedresident and daycamps or similar organizations. Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: no. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 8484.3 of the Education Code is amended to read: 8484.3. (a) Programs established pursuant to this article shall not be required to comply with the requirements of other provisions of this chapter or requirements set forth in Chapter 19 of Division 1 of Title 5 of the California Code of Regulations. (b) Notwithstanding any other provision of law or regulation, an After School Education and Safety Program (ASES) operated by a city, county, or nonprofit organization pursuant to this article may operate for up to 60 hours per week without obtaining a license or special permit under Chapter 3.4 (commencing with Section 1596.70) or Chapter 3.5 (commencing with Section 1596.90) of Division 2 of the Health and Safety Code, provided that a pupil shall not be allowed to attend the ASES program for more than 30 hours per week. An ASES program shall not receive any additional funding pursuant to this subdivision. SEC. 2. Section 1596.793 of the Health and Safety Code is amended to read: 1596.793. This chapter and Chapters 3.5 (commencing with Section 1596.90) and 3.6 (commencing with Section 1597.30) do not apply to recreation programs conducted for children by the YMCA, Girl Scouts of the USA, Boy Scouts of America, Boys and Girls Clubs, Camp Fire USA, organizedresidentcamps,organized day camps,or similar organizations. However, child day care programs conducted by these organizations and the fees charged for those purposes shall be subject to the requirements of this chapter, Chapter 3.5 (commencing with Section 1596.90) and Chapter 3.6 (commencing with Section 1597.30).