California 2011 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB12 Amended / Bill

Filed 08/21/2012

 BILL NUMBER: SB 12AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY AUGUST 21, 2012 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY AUGUST 13, 2012 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY AUGUST 7, 2012 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY JUNE 25, 2012 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MAY 3, 2012 AMENDED IN SENATE JANUARY 4, 2012 INTRODUCED BY Senator Corbett DECEMBER 6, 2010 An act to amend Section 35110 of the Vehicle Code, relating to vehicles. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SB 12, as amended, Corbett. Vehicles: aerodynamic devices. Existing law provides that the total outside width of any vehicle or its load shall not exceed 102 inches,  with specified exceptions including, among others,   except  door handles, hinges, cable cinchers, chain binders, and holders for the display of placards warning of hazardous materials  may extend 3 inches on each side of the vehicle  . This bill would  add an additional exception for   also allow  aerodynamic devices, as defined,  which may   to  extend 3 inches on each side of the vehicle. Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: no. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 35110 of the Vehicle Code is amended to read: 35110. (a) Door handles, hinges, cable cinchers, chain binders, aerodynamic devices, and holders for the display of placards warning of hazardous materials may extend three inches on each side of the vehicle. (b) For purposes of this section, "aerodynamic devices" means devices using technologies that minimize drag and improve airflow over an entire tractor-trailer vehicle. These include gap fairings that reduce turbulence between the tractor and trailer, side skirts that minimize wind under the trailer, and rear fairings that reduce turbulence and pressure drop at the rear of the trailer  ,   if the device does not adversely impact the vehicle's swept width and turning characteristics  .