BILL NUMBER: SB 1200AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY JUNE 19, 2012 AMENDED IN SENATE MAY 25, 2012 AMENDED IN SENATE MAY 2, 2012 INTRODUCED BY Senator Hancock FEBRUARY 22, 2012 An act to add Sections 60605.10 and 60605.11 to the Education Code, relating to academic content standards. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SB 1200, as amended, Hancock. Academic content standards: recommendedadditional standards ormodifications: expert group. Existing law requires the State Board of Education to adopt statewide content and performance standards in the core curriculum areas of reading, writing, mathematics, history/social science, and science, as specified. Existing law authorizes the state board to modify any proposed content standards or performance standards prior to adoption, and to adopt content and performance standards in individual core curriculum areas as those standards are submitted to the state board. Existing law, until July 1, 2014, establishes the Academic Content Standards Commission and requires the commission to develop internationally benchmarked academic content standards, at least 85% of which are required to be the common core academic standards developed by the Common Core State Standards Initiative consortium or another specified interstate collaboration. Existing law requires the commission to present its recommended academic content standards to the state board and requires the state board by August 2, 2010, to either adopt the standards proposed by the commission or reject them. This bill would require the Superintendent of Public Instruction to recommend and the state board to adopt the college and career readiness anchor standards developed by the Common Core State Standards Initiative consortium. The bill would also authorize the state board to take action to resolve any technical issues in the academic content standards it adopted pursuant to the above-described provisions. This bill would authorize the Superintendent to recommend to the state board by July 30, 2013, and the state board to adopt, reject, or modify by September 30, 2013,additional standards ormodifications to the common core academic content standards for English language arts and mathematics. The bill would require the state board to explain, in writing, to the Governor and the Legislature the reasons forapproving the additional standards ormodifying the standards. The bill would require the Superintendent, in consultation with the state board, to consult a group of experts in English language arts and mathematics for purposes of developing the recommendations. The bill would require the Superintendent and the state board to hold a minimum of 2 public hearings in order for the public to provide input on the Superintendent's recommendations. Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 60605.10 is added to the Education Code, to read: 60605.10. For purposes of meeting federal requirements and applying for federal grants, the Superintendent shall recommend and the state board shall adopt the college and career readiness anchor standards developed by the Common Core State Standards Initiative consortium. The state board may also take action to resolve any technical issues in the standards adopted pursuant to Section 60605.8. SEC. 2. Section 60605.11 is added to the Education Code, to read: 60605.11. (a) The Superintendent may recommend to the state board, and the state board may approve,additional standards ormodifications, or both,to the common core academic content standards adopted by the state board pursuant to Section 60605.8. If the state boardapproves additional standards ormodifies the common core academic content standards, it shall explain, in writing, to the Governor and the Legislature the reasons forapproving the additional standards ormodifying the standards. The Superintendent's recommendations and the state board's actions shall assist schools in the implementation of the standards. (1) In consultation with the state board, the Superintendent shall consult a group of experts in English language arts and mathematics for purposes of developing recommendations pursuant to this section. The Superintendent shall ensure that the group of experts includes, but is not limited to, individuals who are teachers of mathematics and English language arts in elementary and secondary schools, schoolsite principals, administrators of school districts or county offices of education, and university professors. (2) The Superintendent and the state board shall hold a minimum of two public hearings pursuant to the Bagley-Keene Open Meeting Act (Article 9 (commencing with Section 11120) of Chapter 1 of Part 1 of Division 3 of Title 2 of the Government Code) in order for the public to provide input on theadditional standards ormodifications recommended pursuant to this section. (3) On or before July 30, 2013, the Superintendent shall present therecommended additional standards ormodifications to the state board. (4) On or before September 30, 2013, the state board shall adopt, reject, or modify the recommendations presented by the Superintendent. (b) Theadditional standards ormodifications to the common core academic content standards that the Superintendent recommends to the state board and that the state board approves shall ensureall of the followingthat : (1) The rigor of the state common core academic content standards is maintained so that all high school graduates are prepared for college and careers, as specified in the common core academic content standards. (2) All of the common core academic standards developed by the consortium or interstate collaboration set forth in Section 60605.7 are adopted.(3) Modifications, including additions and revisions, amount to no more than 15 percent of the common core academic content standards adopted by the state board and improve the implementation of standards and reduce the costs of implementation.(3) The modifications include the anchor standards of the common core academic content standards for English language arts. (4) One set of standards is adopted at each grade level. (5) The content standards for Algebra I are based upon the common core academic content standards for mathematics. (6) Redundant mathematics standards are eliminated. (7) The implementation of standards is improved. (8) The cost of implementing the standards is reduced. (9) The modifications amount to no more than 15 percent of the common core academic content standards adopted by the state board.