California 2011 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1200 Amended / Bill

Filed 08/20/2012

 BILL NUMBER: SB 1200AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY AUGUST 20, 2012 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY AUGUST 6, 2012 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY JULY 3, 2012 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY JUNE 19, 2012 AMENDED IN SENATE MAY 25, 2012 AMENDED IN SENATE MAY 2, 2012 INTRODUCED BY Senator Hancock FEBRUARY 22, 2012 An act to add Sections 60605.10 and 60605.11 to the Education Code, relating to academic content standards. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SB 1200, as amended, Hancock. Academic content standards: recommended modifications: expert group. Existing law requires the State Board of Education to adopt statewide content and performance standards in the core curriculum areas of reading, writing, mathematics, history/social science, and science, as specified. Existing law authorizes the state board to modify any proposed content standards or performance standards prior to adoption, and to adopt content and performance standards in individual core curriculum areas as those standards are submitted to the state board. Existing law, until July 1, 2014, establishes the Academic Content Standards Commission and requires the commission to develop internationally benchmarked academic content standards, at least 85% of which are required to be the common core academic standards developed by the Common Core State Standards Initiative consortium or another specified interstate collaboration. Existing law requires the commission to present its recommended academic content standards to the state board and requires the state board by August 2, 2010, to either adopt the standards proposed by the commission or reject them. This bill would  require   authorize  the Superintendent of Public Instruction to recommend and the state board to adopt the college and career readiness anchor standards developed by the Common Core State Standards Initiative consortium. The bill would also authorize the state board to take action to resolve any technical issues in the  academic   English language arts  content standards it adopted pursuant to the above-described provisions. This bill would authorize the Superintendent to recommend to the state board, and the state board to adopt, reject, or modify, modifications to the common core academic content standards for mathematics by March 30, 2013  , and English language arts by July 30, 2013  . The bill would require the state board to explain, in writing, to the Governor and the Legislature the reasons for modifying the standards. The bill would require the Superintendent, in consultation with the state board, to consult a specified group of experts in  English language arts and  mathematics for purposes of developing the recommendations. The bill would require the Superintendent and the state board to hold a minimum of 2 public hearings in order for the public to provide input on the Superintendent's recommendations.  The bill would require that modifications to the common core academic content standards in mathematics be incorporated into the curriculum framework and the evaluation criteria for mathematics for the purpose of adopting specified instructional materials in mathematics, but this provision would become operative only if AB 1246 of the 2011   -12 Regular Session is enacted.  The provisions of this bill would become inoperative on July 1, 2014, and repealed on January 1, 2015, pursuant to existing law. Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 60605.10 is added to the Education Code, to read: 60605.10. The Superintendent  shall   may  recommend and the state board  shall   may  adopt the college and career readiness anchor standards developed by the Common Core State Standards Initiative consortium. The state board may also take action to resolve any technical issues in the  English language arts  standards adopted pursuant to Section 60605.8. SEC. 2. Section 60605.11 is added to the Education Code, to read: 60605.11. (a) The Superintendent may recommend to the state board, and the state board may approve, modifications to the common core academic content standards  in mathematics  adopted by the state board pursuant to Section 60605.8. If the state board modifies the common core academic content standards  in mathematics  , it shall explain, in writing, to the Governor and the Legislature the reasons for modifying the standards. The Superintendent's recommendations and the state board's actions shall assist schools in the implementation of the standards. (1) In consultation with the state board, the Superintendent shall consult a group of experts in  English language arts and  mathematics for purposes of developing recommendations pursuant to this section. The Superintendent shall ensure that the group of experts includes, but is not limited to, individuals who are teachers of mathematics  and English language arts  in elementary and secondary schools, schoolsite principals, administrators of school districts or county offices of education, and university professors. Not less than one-half of the members of the group shall be currently employed public school teachers. (2) The Superintendent and the state board shall hold a minimum of two public hearings pursuant to the Bagley-Keene Open Meeting Act (Article 9 (commencing with Section 11120) of Chapter 1 of Part 1 of Division 3 of Title 2 of the Government Code) in order for the public to provide input on the modifications recommended pursuant to this section. (3) On or before March 30, 2013, the Superintendent shall recommend modifications to the mathematics standards to the state board, and the state board, by that date, shall adopt, reject, or modify those recommendations.  (4) On or before July 30, 2013, the Superintendent shall recommend modifications to the English language arts standards to the state board, and the state board, by that date, shall adopt, reject, or modify those recommendations.  (b) The modifications to the common core academic content standards  in mathematics  that the Superintendent recommends to the state board and that the state board approves shall ensure all of the following: (1) The rigor of the state common core academic content standards  in mathematics  is maintained so that all high school graduates are prepared for college and careers, as specified in the common core academic content standards. (2) All of the common core academic standards developed by the consortium or interstate collaboration set forth in Section 60605.7 are adopted.  (3) The modifications include the anchor standards of the common core academic content standards for English language arts.   (4)   (3)  One set of standards is adopted at each grade level.  (5)   (4)  The content standards for algebra I are based upon the common core academic content standards for mathematics.  (6)   (5)  Redundant mathematics standards are eliminated.  (7)   (6)  The implementation of standards is improved.  (8)   (7)  Any technical issues in the standards are resolved.  (9)   (8)  The modifications amount to no more than 15 percent of the common core academic content standards adopted by the state board.  (c) (1) Any modifications to the common core academic content standards in mathematics made pursuant to this section shall be incorporated into the curriculum framework and the evaluation criteria for mathematics for the purpose of adopting instructional materials in mathematics pursuant to Section 60207.   (2) This subdivision shall become operative only if Assembly Bill 1246 of the 2011-12 Regular Session is chaptered and becomes effective.