California 2011 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1217 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 08/22/2012

 BILL NUMBER: SB 1217ENROLLED BILL TEXT PASSED THE SENATE AUGUST 21, 2012 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY AUGUST 16, 2012 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY AUGUST 6, 2012 INTRODUCED BY Senator Dutton FEBRUARY 23, 2012 An act to repeal and add Section 14672.95 of the Government Code, relating to state hospitals. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SB 1217, Dutton. State hospitals: Patton State Hospital. Existing law authorizes the Department of General Services to perform various duties relating to state real property, including leasing a building located at Patton State Hospital to a nonprofit corporation or local government, for a period not to exceed 20 years, for the purpose of providing services to elderly persons. This bill would reauthorize the department to lease the specified premises, as described above. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 14672.95 of the Government Code is repealed. SEC. 2. Section 14672.95 is added to the Government Code, to read: 14672.95. Notwithstanding Section 14670, the Director of General Services, with the consent of the State Department of State Hospitals, may let a building located at Patton State Hospital to a nonprofit corporation or local government, for a period not to exceed 20 years, for the purpose of providing services to elderly persons.