BILL NUMBER: SB 1245AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN SENATE MAY 2, 2012 AMENDED IN SENATE APRIL 19, 2012 INTRODUCED BY Senator Alquist FEBRUARY 23, 2012 An act to add and repeal Section 44388 of the Education Code, relating to teacher credentialing. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SB 1245, as amended, Alquist. Teacher credentialing: alternative certification programs report. Existing law requires the Commission on Teacher Credentialing to establish standards for the issuance and renewal of teaching credentials, certificates, and permits, subject to specified provisions of law. Existing law authorizes the operation by a school district, county office of education, college or university, or other public education entity, as specified, of an alternative certification program designed to provide a concentrated program leading to a permanent teaching credential. This bill would, on or before January 1,2014,2015, require the commission to submit a report to the Governor and theLegislaturechairs of the Senate Committee on Education and the Assembly Committee on Education that includes a study of the alternative certification programs offered in other states, as specified, recommendations for appropriate goals of alternative certification programs within the state, as specified,andan assessment of California's current alternative certification programs, as specified , and recommendations as to whether the intern statutes, as specified, should be consolidated . The bill would repeal these provisions on January 1,20182019 . Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 44388 is added to the Education Code, to read: 44388. (a) On or before January 1,2014,2015, the commission shall submit a report to the Governor and theLegislaturechairs of the Senate Committee on Education and the Assembly Committee on Education that includes all of the following: (1) A study of alternative certification programs in other states that use significantly different teacher preparation methods from traditional teacher preparation programs and provide a meaningful alternative model for individuals to enter into the teaching profession. (2) Recommendations for the appropriate goals of alternative certification programs within the state, including, but not limited to, recommendations in regard to the purpose, role, and target audiences of alternative certification programs. (3) An assessment of whether California's current alternative certification programs meet the goals described in paragraph (2). (4) Recommendations as to whether the intern statutes should be consolidated, including, but not limited to, all of the following: (A) District intern statutes including, but not limited to, Article 7.5 (commencing with Section 44325) and Section 44830.3. (B) The Teacher Education Internship Act of 1967 pursuant to Article 3 (commencing with Section 44450) of Chapter 3. (C) The New Careers Program pursuant to Article 5 (commencing with Section 44520) of Chapter 3. (b) (1) A report submitted pursuant to subdivision (a) shall be submitted in compliance with Section 9795 of the Government Code. (2) Pursuant to Section 10231.5 of the Government Code, this section is repealed on January 1,20182019 .